This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:57:39 (UTC).

Huynh v. Walmart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Huynh filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tri Minh Huynh

Bellevue, WA 98006

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Wal-Mart.Com USA LLC

Doug McMillon

Brett Biggs

Marc Lore

Rachel Brand

Gregory B Penner

Timothy P Flynn

S. Robson Walton

Seth Beal

Valerie Ricetti

Audrey Au Joulina

Melvenia Ha

Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

Theodore J Boutrous, Jr.

Rachel Brass

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Eugene Scalia

Ryan Carlton Stewart

Chris Wilson

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rachel S. Brass

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

 

Court Documents

87 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proof of Registered Agent

87 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service

87 #87

Main Document

#86

(#86) Updated and replaced ECF 74-1 I.E., Exhibit I: Proof of Service to the Defendant David Derubertis sued in his official capacity. by Tri Minh Huynh. Amendment to #74 Certificate of Service,, . Based on the updated document from ABC Legal Services, LLC.'s Process Server, this document is filed to replace and update ECF 74-1.. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/3/2022) Modified on 3/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

85 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service

85 #85

Main Document

74 #2

Exhibit 2: Proof of Address of Office

74 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Signed Proof of Svc and Declaration of Mailing

74 #74

Main Document

1 #8

Receipt

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Part 3

1 #5

Exhibit Part 2

1 #4

Exhibit Part 1

1 #3

Part 4

1 #2

Part 3

1 #1

Part 2

1 #1

Main Document

166 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh Service of Process was effectuated upon the Defendant, the deRubertis Law Firm, APC on 03/03/2022 at (time): 2:00 PM by Charles Geurin, a registered California process server working for ABC Legal Services, LLC. Charles Geurin personally served David deRubertis, REGISTERED AGENT who is authorized to receive documents on behalf of the deRubertis Law Firm, APC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proof of Registered Agent)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/5/2022) Modified on 3/7/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Updated and replaced ECF 74-1 I.E., Exhibit I: Proof of Service to the Defendant David Derubertis sued in his official capacity. by Tri Minh Huynh. Amendment to #74 Certificate of Service,, . Based on the updated document from ABC Legal Services, LLC.'s Process Server, this document is filed to replace and update ECF 74-1.. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/3/2022) Modified on 3/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to DEFENDANT RENEE QUEZADA SUED IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AT LIGHTHOUSE GLOBAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to Defendant LIGHTHOUSE GLOBAL (LIGHTHOUSE DOCUMENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to Defendant KATHY VON LINDERN SUED IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AT EPIQ GLOBAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to DEFENDANT DOUGLAS KASALES SUED IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AT EPIQ GLOBAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to DEFENDANT EPIQ GLOBAL (EPIQ EDISCOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to DEFENDANT ROBERT F. OHMES SUED IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS RESEARCH ANALYST AT BOFA SECURITIES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by Tri Minh Huynh As to Defendant BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendant Mark Marchione sued in his personal capacity at 4319 Jackson Pl, Alexandria, VA 22309-2577 on 2/10/2022 by Tri Minh Huynh. Waiver of Service due by 3/14/2022. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tri Minh Huynh.. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Huynh, Tri) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Walmart, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation, Seth Beal, Brett Biggs, Theodore J Boutrous, Jr., Matthew Boyle, Rachel Brand, Rachel Brass, Epig Global, Timothy P Flynn, Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Melvenia Ha, Audrey Au Joulina, Douglas Kasales, Lighthouse Global, Marc Lore, Mark Marchione, Doug McMillon, Robert F Ohmes, Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP, Payne & Fears LLP, Gregory B Penner, Renee Quezada, Valerie Ricetti, Eugene Scalia, Susanna G Schuemann, Ryan Carlton Stewart, The deRubertis Law Firm, APC, William H Thompson, Wal-Mart.Com USA LLC, Walmart, Inc., S. Robson Walton, Chris Wilson, David deRubertis, Kari deRubertis, Kathy von Lindern (Filing fee $ 402. Receipt No. 34611157787). Filed by Tri Minh Huynh. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Exhibit Part 1, #5 Exhibit Part 2, #6 Exhibit Part 3, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Receipt)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Susan Brass