This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 08:42:00 (UTC).

HUVEN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 HUVEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01447

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

James Patrick Hanlon

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN TESTER HUVEN

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

COOK MEDICAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basil E. Adham

Attorney at JOHNSON LAW GROUP

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff KAREN HUVEN. (Adham, Basil) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#6

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#7

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/2/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#7

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#8

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DRB) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01017-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01040-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01299-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01300-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01325-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01346-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01347-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01373-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01510-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01513-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01517-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06823-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06836-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06837-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06838-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06842-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06843-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06845-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06846-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06848-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06856-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01470-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01443-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01452-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 8/2/2022. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01440-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01443-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01452-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/2/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-01447-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DRB) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Basil E. Adham on behalf of Plaintiff KAREN HUVEN. (Adham, Basil) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KAREN HUVEN. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7197648) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adham, Basil) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald