This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 09:50:06 (UTC).

Hutto et al v. Albertsons Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Hutto filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Albertsons Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-07541

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennifer Melnyk

Jaci Hutto

Defendants

Albertson's LLC

Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC

AB Management Services Corp.

Albertsons Companies LLC

New Albertsons L.P.

Albertsons Companies Inc.

AB Acquisition LLC

Albertson's Holdings LLC

Ink Holdings LLC

American Food and Drug LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica L Lukasiewicz

Attorney at Thomas & Solomon

693 East Avenue

Rochester, NY 14607

Deborah A Ferguson

Attorney at Ferguson Durham, PLLC

223 N. 6Th Street, Suite 325

Boise, ID 83702

Jonathan W Ferris

Attorney at Thomas and Solomon LLP

693 East Avenue

Rochester, NY 14607

Craig Durham

Attorney at Ferguson Durham, PLLC

223 N. 6Th Street, Suite 325

Boise, ID 83702

Adam Brett Wolf

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane & Conway

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz

693 East Avenue

Rochester, NY 14607

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M Jensen

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

Pob 2527

Boise, ID 83701

Rod M. Fliegel

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jason Emerson Prince

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

800 W. Main Street, Suite 1750

Boise, ID 83702

Alison S. Hightower

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

333 Bush Street, 34Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Erik F Stidham

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

800 W. Main Street, Suite 1750

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Jonathan W. Ferris is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#36

(#36) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Jessica L. Lukasiewicz is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

35 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#35

(#35) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15355377.) filed by Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

34 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#34

(#34) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15355319.) filed by Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ferris, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#33

(#33) ORDER RE: DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. The deadline for the parties to file a motion for preliminary settlement approval or a further status report is December 30, 2020. Provided that plaintiffs file the motion for preliminary settlement approval by December 30, 2020, the hearing on the motion shall be set for 9:00 a.m. on February 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 21, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

32 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY AP

#32

(#32) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; [Proposed] Order filed by AB Acquisition LLC, AB Management Services Corp., Albertson's Holdings LLC, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies Inc., Albertsons Companies LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Ink Holdings LLC, New Albertsons L.P.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL)(Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Jonathan W. Ferris is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Jessica L. Lukasiewicz is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15355377.) filed by Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15355319.) filed by Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ferris, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 12/30/2020. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 2/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER RE: DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. The deadline for the parties to file a motion for preliminary settlement approval or a further status report is December 30, 2020. Provided that plaintiffs file the motion for preliminary settlement approval by December 30, 2020, the hearing on the motion shall be set for 9:00 a.m. on February 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 21, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; [Proposed] Order filed by AB Acquisition LLC, AB Management Services Corp., Albertson's Holdings LLC, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies Inc., Albertsons Companies LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Ink Holdings LLC, New Albertsons L.P.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL)(Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE - JANUARY 29, 2021 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/6/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Brett Wolf (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 11/3/2020) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rod M. Fliegel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1981556.)Jason Emerson Prince appearing for Defendants AB Acquisition LLC, AB Management Services Corp., Albertson's Holdings LLC, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies, Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings, LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Ink Holdings, LLC, New Albertsons L.P.. Responses due by 12/31/2019 (Prince, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Jason Emerson Prince appearing for Defendants AB Acquisition LLC, AB Management Services Corp., Albertson's Holdings LLC, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons Companies, Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings, LLC, American Food and Drug LLC, Ink Holdings, LLC, New Albertsons L.P.. Responses due by 12/31/2019 (Prince, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Emerson Prince on behalf of All Defendants (Prince, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Melnyk, Jaci Hutto. All Defendants. (Ferris, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 and #4 Motions for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Jonathan W Ferris and Jessica L Lukasiewicz for Jaci Hutto and Jennifer Melnyk. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ERRATA by Plaintiffs Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk re #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jonathan W. Ferris. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1962109.) Corrected Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance. (Durham, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jessica L. Lukasiewicz. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1962114.)Craig Durham appearing for Plaintiffs Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk. Responses due by 11/20/2019 (Durham, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jonathan W. Ferris. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1962109.)Craig Durham appearing for Plaintiffs Jaci Hutto, Jennifer Melnyk. Responses due by 11/20/2019 (Durham, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Albertson's LLC Summons, #2 Albertson's Companies, LLC Summons, #3 New Albertsons L.P. Summons, #4 Albertsons Stores Sub Holding, LLC Summons, #5 AB Acquisition LLC Summons, #6 AB Management Services Corp. Summons, #7 American Food And Drug LLC Summons, #8 Ink Holdings, LLC Summons, #9 Albertson's Holdings LLC Summons) (ckh) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1959404.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Ferguson, Deborah) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Skaggs is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertson's Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AB Acquisition LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant