This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 09:44:57 (UTC).

Hutchison v. Cold Heading Company

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Hutchison filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Cold Heading Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH HUTCHISON

Defendant

Cold Heading Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer L Hitchcock

Attorney at Law Office of Jennifer L Hitchcock

116 E Berry St Ste 625

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Kayla M Ernst

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP - Ind/IN

One American Sq Ste 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Jeffrey M Beemer PHV

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC - Na/TN

424 Church St Ste 800

Nashville, TN 37219

Angelina R Delmastro PHV

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC - Det/MI

500 Woodward Ave Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 46226-3425

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record (Hitchcock Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Ernst

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Notice of Filing

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#16

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 3/23/2021.The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 10/29/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 11/30/2021; and from defendant(s) by 1/14/2022.The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings is 6/30/2021.The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 2/18/2022 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternate dispute resolution. Should the parties proceed with mediation, a notice is to be filed with the Court by 10/29/2021 providing the name of the mediator selected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/23/2021. (bas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/23/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Jennifer Hitchcock. Dft appeared by attys Jeffrey Beemer, Angelina Delmastro, and Kayla Ernst. The #13 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Should Parties proceed with mediation, a notice is to be filed with the Court by 10/29/2021 providing the selection of a mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/16/2021. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#14) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 2/23/2021 at 9:30 am. Change in time only. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey M Beemer PHV for Cold Heading Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/5/2021. (ace) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Application for Attorney Jeffrey M. Beemer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cold Heading Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4473812(Wood, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Angelina R Delmastro PHV for Cold Heading Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/2/2021. (ace) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Cold Heading Company.(Ernst, Kayla) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Attorney Angelina R Delmastro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cold Heading Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4464068(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketJudge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (bas) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cold Heading Company identifying Corporate Parent Beachlawn Inc for Cold Heading Company.. (Ernst, Kayla) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Notice of Removal Procedures. (Ernst, Kayla) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla M Ernst on behalf of Cold Heading Company (Ernst, Kayla) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4457224.) from Steuben County, Indiana, Superior Court, Cause No. 76D01-2012-CT-000508, filed by Cold Heading Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Hitchcock Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Ernst Appearance, Notice of Auto Extension), #2 Exhibit B - State Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ernst, Kayla) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L Hitchcock