This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:18:50 (UTC).

HUTCHINSON v 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 HUTCHINSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00651

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIC S. HUTCHISON

Defendant

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER R BAGLEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES SCOTT FARRIN - DURHAM NC

280 S Mangum Street, Suite 400

Durham, NC 27701

GARY W JACKSON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES SCOTT FARRIN - DURHAM NC

280 S Mangum Street, Suite 400

Durham, NC 27701

HOYT G. TESSENER

Attorney at Law Offices of James Scott Farrin

280 S. Mangum Street, Suite 400, Suite 400

Durham, NC 27701

 

Court Documents

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00113. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#10

(#10) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of April 3, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 4/15/2019.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

9 #1

Delivery Notification

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

7 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - Motion to Transfer in MDL No. 2885

7 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Interested Party Response in MDL No. 2885

#7

(#7) Notice of Related Case filed by Eric S. Hutchison re: MDL No. 2885. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Interested Party Response in MDL No. 2885, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Motion to Transfer in MDL No. 2885) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Eric S. Hutchison (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Hoyt G. Tessener on behalf of Eric S. Hutchison. (Tessener, Hoyt) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Gary W. Jackson on behalf of Eric S. Hutchison. (Jackson, Gary) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Bagley on behalf of Eric S. Hutchison. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Eric S. Hutchison. Amendment to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4874212.), filed by Eric S. Hutchison. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00113. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of April 3, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 4/15/2019.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Eric S. Hutchison served on 3M Company on March 25, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Delivery Notification) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:19-CV-113-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/20/2019. (Hockaday, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Related Case filed by Eric S. Hutchison re: MDL No. 2885. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Interested Party Response in MDL No. 2885, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Motion to Transfer in MDL No. 2885) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Eric S. Hutchison (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Hoyt G. Tessener on behalf of Eric S. Hutchison. (Tessener, Hoyt) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Gary W. Jackson on behalf of Eric S. Hutchison. (Jackson, Gary) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Bagley on behalf of Eric S. Hutchison. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Eric S. Hutchison. Amendment to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4874212.), filed by Eric S. Hutchison. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.