This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:59:41 (UTC).

Hutchins et al v. ANCO Insulations, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Hutchins filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ANCO Insulations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11326

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evelyn Hutchins

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Anco Insulators, Inc.

CBS Corporation

LGS Technologies

Buck Kreihs Company, Inc.

General Electric Company

Owens-Illinois Inc

Certain-Teed Corporation

Bexar Canyon Management, Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Union Carbide Coporation

Foster Wheeler Corporation

John Crane Inc

Grefco, Inc.

Maryland Casualty Company

International Paper Company

Goulds Pumps LLC

A.W. Chesterson Company

Cross Claimant, Defendant and Cross Defendant

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Claimant, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

H. Philip Radecker, Jr.

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Lawrence G. Pugh, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Mitchell F Tedesco

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius (Houston)

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

Edward Wade Carpenter

Attorney at MehaffyWeber, PC

P.O. Box 16

Beaumont, TX 77704

Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

William Claudy Harrison, Jr.

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer E. Adams

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephanie Moore Hartman

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#7

#6

#4

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain-Teed Corporation (Ormsby, Barbara) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, by Certain-Teed Corporation.Attorney Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby added to party Certain-Teed Corporation(pty:dft).(Ormsby, Barbara) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Corporation (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Wrongful Death by Foster Wheeler Corporation.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Foster Wheeler Corporation(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiffs Original Petition and Wrongful Death by Ingersoll-Rand Company.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Ingersoll-Rand Company(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, by Buck Kreihs Company, Inc..Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Buck Kreihs Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Radecker, H.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for More Definite Statement by International Paper Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Atwood & Morrill.Attorney Jennifer E. Adams added to party Atwood & Morrill(pty:dft).(Adams, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Kay Clark on behalf of Derek Hutchins, Dolan Hutchins, Evelyn Conerly Hutchins. Attorney Meredith Kay Clark added to party Derek Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Meredith Kay Clark added to party Dolan Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Meredith Kay Clark added to party Evelyn Conerly Hutchins(pty:pla).(Clark, Meredith) Modified on 7/23/2019 (cg). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Triplex Inc.Attorney Edward Wade Carpenter added to party Triplex Inc.(pty:dft).(Carpenter, Edward) Modified link and text on 7/21/2019 (cg). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #6 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk(cg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC DOC. 3 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENTS** State Court Pleasings filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cg). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-6349 (Fee previously paid) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (cg). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC DOC. 3 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENTS***NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-6349 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7720225) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cg). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.W. Chesterson Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Bexar Canyon Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc. is a litigant