This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 09:05:10 (UTC).

Hutchings et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Hutchings filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David D. Noce. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00772

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David D. Noce

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeremy Hutchings

Jessica Hutchings

Defendants

Monsanto Company

130 S. Benniston Ave., Suite 700

Clayton, MO 63105

John Does 1 through 100 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily Jo Kirk

Attorney at MCCUNE WRIGHT LLP - Ontario

3281 East Guasti Rd., Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet

1 #2

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #3

Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server

1 #4

Summons Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings Process Server: Ace Legal Services (JDC) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED ORIGINAL FILING FORM by Plaintiffs Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings. (Kirk, Emily) Modified on 7/21/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL FILING FORM by Plaintiffs Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings. (Kirk, Emily) Modified on 7/21/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-345) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Signed by by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/9/2022. (JWD) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • Docket***REMARK --CASE: 4:22-cv-00772 -- DETAILS: Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:22-cv-04636, filed 08/11/2022. (MRC) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-345) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Signed by by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/9/2022. (JWD) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL FILING FORM by Plaintiffs Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings. (Kirk, Emily) Modified on 7/21/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED ORIGINAL FILING FORM by Plaintiffs Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings. (Kirk, Emily) Modified on 7/21/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings Process Server: Ace Legal Services (JDC) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-9410740, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Jeremy Hutchings, Jessica Hutchings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #4 Summons Summons)(Kirk, Emily) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Jo Kirk