This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:13:32 (UTC).

Hussain v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Hussain filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-02145

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rizwan Seyed Hussain

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19057576) filed by Rizwan Hussain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form N-400 Filing Receipt, #2 Exhibit Notice, Naturalization Interview (03/21/21), #3 Exhibit Form N-652, Naturalization Results, #4 Exhibit Notice, Naturalization Interview (12/01/21, #5 Exhibit Current Web Portal Info, #6 Exhibit Jacksonville USCIS Processing Report, #7 Exhibit How To Read USCIS Processing Reports, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons, Mayorkas, #10 Proposed Summons, Jaddou)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/22/2021 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Form N-400 Filing Receipt

1 #2

Exhibit Notice, Naturalization Interview (03/21/21)

1 #3

Exhibit Form N-652, Naturalization Results

1 #4

Exhibit Notice, Naturalization Interview (12/01/21

1 #5

Exhibit Current Web Portal Info

1 #6

Exhibit Jacksonville USCIS Processing Report

1 #7

Exhibit How To Read USCIS Processing Reports

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Proposed Summons, Mayorkas

1 #10

Proposed Summons, Jaddou

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Rizwan Seyed Hussain. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed by Rizwan Seyed Hussain. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 1/3/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 1/25/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS returned executed by Rizwan Seyed Hussain. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 1/20/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 1/25/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BD) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-2145-RBD-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19057576) filed by Rizwan Hussain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form N-400 Filing Receipt, #2 Exhibit Notice, Naturalization Interview (03/21/21), #3 Exhibit Form N-652, Naturalization Results, #4 Exhibit Notice, Naturalization Interview (12/01/21, #5 Exhibit Current Web Portal Info, #6 Exhibit Jacksonville USCIS Processing Report, #7 Exhibit How To Read USCIS Processing Reports, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons, Mayorkas, #10 Proposed Summons, Jaddou)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/22/2021 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Stoller