This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:24:07 (UTC).

Husel v. Trinity Health Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Husel against Trinity Health Corporation in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12478

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

George Caram Steeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William S. Husel

Defendants

Trinity Health Corporation

Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN)

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit Integrated Risk Liability Policy

1 #4

Exhibit Buffer Layer Liability Policy

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit Physician Employment Agreement

#1

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline to answer #1 Complaint, Response due by 10/30/2019 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #10

Exhibit Reservation of Rights Letter dated 1.29.19

1 #9

Exhibit Civil Complaints

1 #12

Exhibit Demand Letter dated 7.8.19

1 #11

Exhibit Supplemental Reservation of Rights Letter dated 4.15.19

21 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by William S. Husel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

19 #1

Exhibit A

#20

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#19

(#19) MOTION To Redact Complaint Exhibits 2-5 by Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Yu, Elise) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#18

(#18) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William S. Husel. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William S. Husel. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John S Worden appearing on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation (Worden, John) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Med. License Verif., #3 Exhibit 2 - Murder Indictments, #4 Exhibit 3 - Employment Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Columbus Dispatch Article, #6 Exhibit 5 - Mongelli II v. Chi. Ins. Co., #7 Exhibit 6 - Initial Emp. Agreement) (Awan, Mohamed) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by William S. Husel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge George Caram Steeh: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William S. Husel Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Ronald DiBartolomeo) (MBea) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SEALED EXHIBIT re #19 MOTION To Redact Complaint Exhibits 2-5 by Trinity Health Corporation. (Yu, Elise) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION To Redact Complaint Exhibits 2-5 by Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Yu, Elise) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William S. Husel. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William S. Husel. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John S Worden appearing on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation (Worden, John) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Med. License Verif., #3 Exhibit 2 - Murder Indictments, #4 Exhibit 3 - Employment Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Columbus Dispatch Article, #6 Exhibit 5 - Mongelli II v. Chi. Ins. Co., #7 Exhibit 6 - Initial Emp. Agreement) (Awan, Mohamed) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ruth Goodell, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ohio State License Medical Board Look-up, #4 Exhibit 3 - Criminal Case Orders) (Yu, Elise) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline to answer #1 Complaint, Response due by 10/30/2019 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Abel on behalf of Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN). (Abel, Jason) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN) served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elise Hyejin Yu appearing on behalf of Trinity Health Corporation (Yu, Elise) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trinity Health Corporation served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Response due by 9/16/2019 Reply due by 9/30/2019 Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh in courtroom #251. Plaintiff must serve a copy of this Notice on defendants and/or their attorneys ASAP. (MBea) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William S. Husel. (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Trinity Health Corporation* (DWor) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN)* (DWor) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by William S. Husel against Trinity Assurance Limited (CAYMAN), Trinity Health Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7376069 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Franklin - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Physician Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Integrated Risk Liability Policy, #4 Exhibit Buffer Layer Liability Policy, #5 Exhibit Excess Integrated Risk Liability Policy, #6 Exhibit High Excess Layer Policy, #7 Exhibit Indictment, #8 Exhibit The Columbus Dispatch article, #9 Exhibit Civil Complaints, #10 Exhibit Reservation of Rights Letter dated 1.29.19, #11 Exhibit Supplemental Reservation of Rights Letter dated 4.15.19, #12 Exhibit Demand Letter dated 7.8.19, #13 Exhibit Second Supplemental Reservation of Rights Letter dated 8.5.19, #14 Exhibit Denial of Coverage for Criminal Indictments Letter dated 8.5.19) (Ford, Adam) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.