This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 08:33:48 (UTC).

HURTADO v. RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 HURTADO filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02146

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRYSTAL HURTADO

Defendants

RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHANE L. WEAVER

Attorney at SHANE WEAVER LAW

33 Robin Hood Drive

Etters, PA 17319

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN M. BURNETTE

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER OF 7/19/22 THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE JULY 20, 2022, A STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL IS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 20, 2022 AT 10:00AM. ETC. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 18, 2022. ETC. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY DECEMBER 2, 2022. RESPONSES NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 16, 2022. ETC. NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 10, 2023 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ETC ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023. RESPONSES NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 24, 2023. ETC. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MARCH 8, 2023 AT 3:00PM. ETC. JURY SELECTION SHALL BE HELD IN PHILADELPHIA ON MARCH 17, 2023 AT 9:00AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. JURY TRIAL SHALL COMMMENCE ON MARCH 20, 2023 AT 9:00AM. THIS ORDER SHALL SERVE AS A FORMAL ATTACHMENT FOR TRIAL. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/19/22. 7/19/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P., filed by CRYSTAL HURTADO.(er) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT, IS GRANTED. THE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE DOCKETED BY THE CLERK OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/18/22.7/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

12 #4

Text of Proposed Order

12 #3

Certificate of Service

12 #2

Affidavit

12 #1

Exhibit

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Discovery Plan by CRYSTAL HURTADO.(WEAVER, SHANE) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#10

(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. 1. The in-person Rule 16 Conference in the above-captioned matter in Chambers before Judge John M. Gallagher on Tuesday, July 19, 2022 at 11:00 AM, (ECF No. 7) is Cancelled. 2. Lead counsel shall appear VIA TELEPHONE for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, July 19, 2022 at 11:00 AM, by providing a calling bridge to the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. (er) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(WEAVER, SHANE) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

8 #1

Consent

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. TAKE NOTICE, that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows:Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, July 19, 2022 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania, etc. (er) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Resurgent Holdings, LLC; Alegis Group, LLC with Certificate of Service by RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sherman Originator, LLC with Certificate of Service by LVNV FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER OF 7/19/22 THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE JULY 20, 2022, A STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL IS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 20, 2022 AT 10:00AM. ETC. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 18, 2022. ETC. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY DECEMBER 2, 2022. RESPONSES NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 16, 2022. ETC. NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 10, 2023 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ETC ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023. RESPONSES NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 24, 2023. ETC. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MARCH 8, 2023 AT 3:00PM. ETC. JURY SELECTION SHALL BE HELD IN PHILADELPHIA ON MARCH 17, 2023 AT 9:00AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. JURY TRIAL SHALL COMMMENCE ON MARCH 20, 2023 AT 9:00AM. THIS ORDER SHALL SERVE AS A FORMAL ATTACHMENT FOR TRIAL. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/19/22. 7/19/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Pretrial Conference held on 7/19/22. (mas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P., filed by CRYSTAL HURTADO.(er) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT, IS GRANTED. THE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE DOCKETED BY THE CLERK OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/18/22.7/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First MOTION to Amend/Correct by concurrence filed by CRYSTAL HURTADO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WEAVER, SHANE) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Discovery Plan by CRYSTAL HURTADO.(WEAVER, SHANE) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. 1. The in-person Rule 16 Conference in the above-captioned matter in Chambers before Judge John M. Gallagher on Tuesday, July 19, 2022 at 11:00 AM, (ECF No. 7) is Cancelled. 2. Lead counsel shall appear VIA TELEPHONE for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, July 19, 2022 at 11:00 AM, by providing a calling bridge to the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. (er) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(WEAVER, SHANE) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mcos, ) Modified on 6/24/2022 (afm). (FILED IN ERROR) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. TAKE NOTICE, that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows:Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, July 19, 2022 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania, etc. (er) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Resurgent Holdings, LLC; Alegis Group, LLC with Certificate of Service by RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sherman Originator, LLC with Certificate of Service by LVNV FUNDING, LLC.(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P..(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (WEAVER, SHANE) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15956987), filed by LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(BURNETTE, LAUREN) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/2/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Burnette