This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 07:01:22 (UTC).

HURST et al v. JARDEN CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 HURST filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against JARDEN CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03857

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDRA HURST

ROBERT HURST

SERENA B. HILL-WHITEFIELD

BRYAN AIREY

Defendants

JARDEN CORPORATION

NEWELL BRANDS, INC.

SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.

THE HOLMES GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN

Attorney at de Luca Levine

301 E. Germantown Pike, 3Rd Fl, Suite 220

East Norriton, PA 19422

Defendant Attorney

Avery J Quiles

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES P.CC

860 First Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 18, 2022; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL DISCOVERY BY APRIL 14, 2023; AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY MAY 5, 2023. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, AS JUDGE REID DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/31/2022. 10/31/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 31, 2022 AT 2:00 PM, IN CHAMBERS ROOM 12613, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/07/2022. 10/07/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO UNREP. DEF.(ja) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SERENA B. HILL-WHITEFIELD, ROBERT HURST, BRYAN AIREY, SANDRA HURST re: Gavin Castagna served Summons and Complaint upon THE HOLMES GROUP, INC. by 10/05/2022. THE HOLMES GROUP, INC. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#12

(#12) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by JARDEN CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail re: served Complaint upon Newell Brands by Certified Mail on 09/09/2022 (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 6, 2022, DEFENDANTS SHALL EITHER (A) FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER, ASSERTING ONLY AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THAT IT HAS A GOOD FAITH BASIS TO ASSERT, OR (B) SHOW CAUSE, IN A MEMORANDUM NOT TO EXCEED 10 PAGES, WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT STRIKE ALL OF THE ASSERTED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 11(C)(3). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/29/2022. 9/29/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to THE HOLMES GROUP, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/29/22 (JL) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail re: served Complaint upon Jarden Corporation by Certified Mail on 9/28/2022 (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#7

(#7) Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons filed by BRYAN AIREY, SERENA B. HILL-WHITEFIELD, ROBERT HURST, SANDRA HURST. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by JARDEN CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SUNBEAM CORPORATION, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) Modified on 9/29/2022 (fb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NEWELL BRANDS, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) Modified on 9/29/2022 (fb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JARDEN CORPORATION.(QUILES, AVERY) Modified on 9/29/2022 (fb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by AVERY J. QUILES on behalf of JARDEN CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS, SUNBEAM CORPORATION, INC. with Certificate of Service(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 18, 2022; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL DISCOVERY BY APRIL 14, 2023; AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY MAY 5, 2023. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, AS JUDGE REID DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/31/2022. 10/31/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 10/31/22. (JL) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCopy of Order/Notice dated 10/7/22 (Document # 15) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to THE HOLMES GROUP, INC. for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED.. (amas) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 31, 2022 AT 2:00 PM, IN CHAMBERS ROOM 12613, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/07/2022. 10/07/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO UNREP. DEF.(ja) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SERENA B. HILL-WHITEFIELD, ROBERT HURST, BRYAN AIREY, SANDRA HURST re: Gavin Castagna served Summons and Complaint upon THE HOLMES GROUP, INC. by 10/05/2022. THE HOLMES GROUP, INC. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#13) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by JARDEN CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail re: served Complaint upon Newell Brands by Certified Mail on 09/09/2022 (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 6, 2022, DEFENDANTS SHALL EITHER (A) FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER, ASSERTING ONLY AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES THAT IT HAS A GOOD FAITH BASIS TO ASSERT, OR (B) SHOW CAUSE, IN A MEMORANDUM NOT TO EXCEED 10 PAGES, WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT STRIKE ALL OF THE ASSERTED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 11(C)(3). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/29/2022. 9/29/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to THE HOLMES GROUP, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/29/22 (JL) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail re: served Complaint upon Jarden Corporation by Certified Mail on 9/28/2022 (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons filed by BRYAN AIREY, SERENA B. HILL-WHITEFIELD, ROBERT HURST, SANDRA HURST. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by JARDEN CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SUNBEAM CORPORATION, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) Modified on 9/29/2022 (fb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NEWELL BRANDS, INC..(QUILES, AVERY) Modified on 9/29/2022 (fb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JARDEN CORPORATION.(QUILES, AVERY) Modified on 9/29/2022 (fb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by AVERY J. QUILES on behalf of JARDEN CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS, SUNBEAM CORPORATION, INC. with Certificate of Service(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWELL BRANDS, SUNBEAM CORPORATION, INC., JARDEN CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16205008), filed by NEWELL BRANDS, SUNBEAM CORPORATION, INC., JARDEN CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(QUILES, AVERY) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLMES is a litigant

Latest cases where Jarden Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Newell Brands DTC, Inc. is a litigant