This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 10:09:39 (UTC).

Hurricane Electric LLC v. Millennium Funding, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Hurricane Electric LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Millennium Funding, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01034

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hurricane Electric LLC

Defendants

Criminal Productions, Inc.

Survivor Productions, Inc.

LHF Productions, Inc.

Rambo V Productions, Inc.

Wicked Nevada, LLC

Cobbler Nevada, LLC

Trevor Short

Avi Lerner

211 Productions, Inc.

Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.

Voltage Development NCCF, LLC

Millennium Funding, Inc.

UN4 Productions, Inc.

Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC

Homefront Productions, Inc.

Stoic Productions, Inc.

Bodyguard Productions, Inc.

Clear Skies Nevada, LLC

Millennium Media, Inc.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua M Dickey

Attorney at Bailey Kennedy

8984 Spanish Ridge Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89148-1302

Neil D Greenstein

Attorney at TechMark Greenstein Law, P.C.

1751 Pinnacle Drive, Suite 1000

Tysons, VA 22102

Defendant Attorneys

F. Christopher Austin

Attorney at Weide & Miller, Ltd.

10655 Park Run Drive, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Kerry Steven Culpepper

75-170 Hualalai Road Suite B204

Kailua Kona, HI 96740

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

15 #2

Survivor Productions, Inc.

15 #1

Trevor Short

#15

#13

#12

RESTRICTED

10 #16

Rambo V Productions, Inc.

10 #12

Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.

10 #11

Homefront Productions, Inc.

10 #10

HB Productions, Inc.

10 #9

Fallen Productions, Inc.

10 #8

Criminal Productions, Inc.

10 #7

Bodyguard Productions, Inc.

10 #5

Wicked Nevada LLC

10 #1

Cobbler Nevada LLC

#5

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Voltage Holdings, LLC for Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC added. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kerry Steven Culpepper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition,,, by Defendants 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Austin, F.) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hurricane Electric LLC re #5 Summons Issued. Avi Lerner waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020; Trevor Short waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020; Survivor Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Trevor Short, #2 Survivor Productions, Inc.) (Dickey, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2020 Re: #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. INCOMPLETE. Counsel is directed to READ and COMPLY with the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court, District of Nevada, LR IA 10-2, "Admission to Practice in a Particular Case."Attorneys F. Christopher Austin nor Kerry Steven Culpepper CANNOT sign for their client. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that on Page 5, Appointment of Designated Resident Nevada Counsel, Plaintiff's "Authorized Representative" is directed to sign his/her name on the signature line, and print his/her name and title below the signature line. ( /s/ or a typewritten name is NOT acceptable). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition,,, by Defendants 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Austin, F.) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) VIEW Corrected Image #16 re: MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kerry Steven Culpepper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6083021) by Defendants 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Austin, F.) Modified on 8/5/2020 (SLD). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kerry S. Culpepper to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/14/2020. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hurricane Electric LLC re #5 Summons Issued. 211 Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Bodyguard Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Clear Skies Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Cobbler Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Criminal Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Fallen Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; HB Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Homefront Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; LHF Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Millennium Funding, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Millennium Media, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Rambo V Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Status Update, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Stoic Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; UN4 Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Voltage Development NCCF, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Wicked Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cobbler Nevada LLC, #2 Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, #3 Status Update, LLC, #4 Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, #5 Wicked Nevada LLC, #6 211 Productions, Inc., #7 Bodyguard Productions, Inc., #8 Criminal Productions, Inc., #9 Fallen Productions, Inc., #10 HB Productions, Inc., #11 Homefront Productions, Inc., #12 Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., #13 LHF Productions, Inc., #14 Millennium Funding, Inc., #15 Millennium Media, Inc., #16 Rambo V Productions, Inc., #17 Stoic Productions, Inc., #18 UN4 Productions, Inc.) (Dickey, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neil D. Greenstein and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joshua M. Dickey. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/24/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Hurricane Electric LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Dickey, Joshua) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Proper Verified Petition due within 7 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Verified Petition Forms)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF with proper forms attached and mailed to counsel as directed - DRS) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Neil D. Greenstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joshua M. Dickey (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6049057) by Plaintiff Hurricane Electric LLC. (Dickey, Joshua) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (DRS) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued 211 Productions, Inc. by Plaintiff Hurricane Electric LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bodyguard Productions, Inc., #2 Summons Cobbler Nevada, LLC, #3 Summons Criminal Productions, Inc., #4 Summons Fallen Productions, Inc., #5 Summons Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, #6 Summons HB Productions, Inc., #7 Summons Homefront Productions, Inc., #8 Summons Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., #9 Summons Avi Lerner, #10 Summons LHF Productions, Inc., #11 Summons Millennium Funding, Inc., #12 Summons Millennium Media, Inc., #13 Summons Rambo V Productions, Inc., #14 Summons Trevor Short, #15 Summons Status Update, LLC, #16 Summons Stoic Productions, Inc., #17 Summons Survivor Productions, Inc., #18 Summons UN4 Productions, Inc., #19 Summons Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, #20 Summons Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, #21 Summons Wicked Nevada LLC) (Dickey, Joshua) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 121 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a copyright. Mailed with a copy of the complaint to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. ( mailed this date - DRS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/11/2020) (DRS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #1 Complaint sent to Copyright office) (DRS). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hurricane Electric LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Mike Leber, Other Affiliate Paula Leber for Hurricane Electric LLC added. (Dickey, Joshua) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6038323) by Hurricane Electric LLC. Proof of service due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickey, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Skies Nevada, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cobbler Nevada, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Criminal Productions, Inc. is a litigant