This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 07:37:07 (UTC).

Hurd v. Equifax Information Services LLC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Hurd filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and Lee P. Rudofsky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00261

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

D. P. Marshall Jr.

Lee P. Rudofsky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philip Lee Hurd

Defendant

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Marco

Attorney at SmithMarco, P.C.

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Larry Paul Smith

Attorney at SmithMarco, P.C.

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Ralph D. Scott, III

Attorney at Lax, Vaughan, Fortson, Rowe & Threet P.A.

Cantrell West Building, 11300 Cantrell Road, Suite 201

Little Rock, AR 72212

Roger D. Rowe

Attorney at Lax, Vaughan, Fortson, Rowe & Threet P.A.

Cantrell West Building, 11300 Cantrell Road, Suite 201

Little Rock, AR 72212

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Scott, Ralph) (Docket text modified on 11/15/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger D. Rowe on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Rowe, Roger) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph D. Scott, III on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joseph L. Gentilcore. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3564044. Filed by Philip Lee Hurd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Larry) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#3

(#3) RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT074118 (bmd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Paul Smith on behalf of Philip Lee Hurd (Smith, Larry) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Philip Lee Hurd. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • (#12) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/15/2019. (jak) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Scott, Ralph) (Docket text modified on 11/15/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #8 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 14 November 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/25/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger D. Rowe on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Rowe, Roger) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph D. Scott, III on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #4 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joseph L. Gentilcore. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3564044. Filed by Philip Lee Hurd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Larry) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT074118 (bmd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Paul Smith on behalf of Philip Lee Hurd (Smith, Larry) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Philip Lee Hurd. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less