This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2021 at 09:43:32 (UTC).

Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc. v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Hunter's Precision Construction Roofing, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Domenico and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03493

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc. doing business as Precision Construction & Roofing

Defendants

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert D. Green

Attorney at Robert D. Green & Associates, PC

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Hunter M. Klein

Attorney at Robert Green & Associates, P.C.

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert D. Green on behalf of Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.Attorney Robert D. Green added to party Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.(pty:pla) (Green, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter M. Klein on behalf of Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.Attorney Hunter M. Klein added to party Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.(pty:pla) (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/26/2021 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/19/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/2/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 December 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Michael Anthony Martinez, District Court Judge, Denver County 11/17/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 10/30/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed by Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc..(alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

STATE COURT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complai

1 #5

STATE COURT - Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

STATE COURT - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #3

STATE COURT - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020cv33625. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7605739), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 STATE COURT - Complaint, #4 STATE COURT - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 STATE COURT - Delay Reduction Order, #6 STATE COURT - Notice of Service, #7 STATE COURT - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #8 STATE COURT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2021 10:45 AM is VACATED and RESET for 2/4/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The parties shall submit a joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 1/28/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/17/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert D. Green on behalf of Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.Attorney Robert D. Green added to party Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.(pty:pla) (Green, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter M. Klein on behalf of Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.Attorney Hunter M. Klein added to party Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc.(pty:pla) (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/26/2021 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/19/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/2/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE pursuant to #10 . Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03493-DDD-STV.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 December 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/30/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Michael Anthony Martinez, District Court Judge, Denver County 11/17/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 10/30/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed by Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc..(alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020cv33625. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7605739), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 STATE COURT - Complaint, #4 STATE COURT - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 STATE COURT - Delay Reduction Order, #6 STATE COURT - Notice of Service, #7 STATE COURT - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #8 STATE COURT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hunter's Precision Construction & Roofing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunter M. Klein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D. Green