This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:44:55 (UTC).

Hunter v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Hunter filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Smith Nephew, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melford T. Hunter

Defendant

Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell S Kohn

Attorney at Kohn Law Office

2170 S. El Camino Real #201

Oceanside, CA 92054

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848978.), filed by Melford T. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohn, Russell) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#30

(#3) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for February 27, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

26 #2

Exhibit B (THA Track Cases)

26 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

26 #1445

(#4) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

27 #1

Exhibit A -Letter from S&N to Plaintiffs 2-18-19

27 #1446

(#5) Status Report Submitted in Response to Dkt. No. 1438 by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Letter from S&N to Plaintiffs 2-18-19)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#29

(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 13. Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#28

(#28) MEMORANDUM to Counsel Confirming the results of the telephone conference held today. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

28 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

28 #2

Exhibit B (THA Track Cases)

28 #1515

(#27) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#26

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1507

(#25) Consent MOTION for Other Relief for Entry of Case Management Order No. 13 Concerning Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve a Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#26

(#24) Supplemental to (1503 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Status Report filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Exhibit 1 to Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 13. Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMORANDUM to Counsel Confirming the results of the telephone conference held today. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/10/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 47. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter) (Entered: 04/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Consent MOTION for Other Relief for Entry of Case Management Order No. 13 Concerning Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve a Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Supplemental to (1503 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Status Report filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Exhibit 1 to Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed Ex Parte filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Ex Parte by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. re (1173 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Dismiss THA and R3 Master Amended Consolidated Complaints and Short Form Complaints of Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Markland v. Insys Therapeutics))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Status Report Submitted in Response to Dkt. No. 1438 by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Letter from S&N to Plaintiffs 2-18-19)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for February 27, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848978.), filed by Melford T. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohn, Russell) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.