This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2019 at 07:22:38 (UTC).

Hunter v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Hunter filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01634

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Connie Hunter

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric D. Holland

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW FIRM LLC

300 N. Tucker Blvd., Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63101

Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.

Attorney at DUNKEN LAW GROUP

1 Sugar Creek Center Blvd., Suite 1075

Sugar Land, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

Cicely I. Lubben

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

100 S. 4Th St., Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. . (Dunken, Bert) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - See Order For Details Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/2/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 07/02/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7259131, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Ethicon Inc, #4 Summons Johnson and Johnson)(Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

1 #3

Summons Ethicon Inc

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Summons Johnson and Johnson

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Cicely I. Lubben for Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ethicon, Inc..(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. Parent companies: Johnson & Johnson, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Johnson & Johnson,. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Cicely I. Lubben for Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

7 #2

Summons

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

7 #1

Summons

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. . (Dunken, Bert) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - See Order For Details Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/2/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 07/02/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Cicely I. Lubben for Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ethicon, Inc..(Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. Parent companies: Johnson & Johnson, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: Johnson & Johnson,. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Cicely I. Lubben for Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. (Lubben, Cicely) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Connie Hunter. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Connie Hunter. Ethicon, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#4) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.'s Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 6/17/19. (THL) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Terry Dunken. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7279671) by Plaintiff Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dunken, Bert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Eric D. Holland. (MFG) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Connie Hunter re #1 Complaint, (Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7259131, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Connie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Ethicon Inc, #4 Summons Johnson and Johnson)(Holland, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.