This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:10:20 (UTC).

In re: Amos R. Hunter

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 In re Amos R Hunter was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Walter T. McGovern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-RD-00080

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Walter T. McGovern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amos R Hunter

Spokane, WA 99201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amos R Hunter

1318 W. College Avenue, Suite 880

Spokane, WA 99201

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending Amos R. Hunter from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Mailed Order to Address on Docket. (DS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Order Granting Petition for Suspension Pursuant to ELC 7.3, Order No. 201-911-1.(DS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Mailed Order to address on docket.(DS) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Mail addressed to Amos R. Hunter at 1318 W. College Ave STE 880, Spokane, WA 99201 returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (DS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending Amos R. Hunter from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Mailed Order to Address on Docket. (DS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Mail addressed to Amos R. Hunter at 1318 W. College Ave STE 880, Spokane, WA 99201 returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Mailed Order to address on docket.(DS) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Order Granting Petition for Suspension Pursuant to ELC 7.3, Order No. 201-911-1.(DS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less