This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2020 at 08:46:57 (UTC).

Hunt v. The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Hunt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05168

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Hunt

Defendants

The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc. also known as Lions Club International doing business as Prairie Grove Lion

Lions Club International

The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc. also known as Lions Club International doing business as Prairie Grove Lions Club

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donnie Rutledge

Attorney at Lisle Rutledge P.A.

1458 Plaza Place

Springdale, AR 72764

Stephen A Lisle

Attorney at Lisle Rutledge P.A.

1458 Plaza Place, Suite 101, P. O. Box 7977

Springdale, AR 72766-7977

Defendant Attorneys

Dustin Doty

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

3333 Pinnacle Hills Parkway, Suite 510

Rogers, AR 72758

Michael A. Thompson

Attorney at Wright Lindsey Jennings LLP

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Exhibit Arkansas Department of Parks and Tourism Division of State Parks Concess

#11

#12

#13

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case: re #13 Motion to Dismiss (Notice of Dismissal) filed by Michele Hunt (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). (tg) (tg). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Thirteenth MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Michele Hunt. (Rutledge, Donnie) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.. (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.. (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss due to the filing of an amended complaint. Defendant may file a renewed motion to dismiss tailored to the current complaint, if appropriate. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 5, 2020. (rab) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #3 Complaint against The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc. a/k/a Lions Club International d/b/a Prairie Grove Lions Club, filed by Michele Hunt. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Michele Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arkansas Department of Parks and Tourism Division of State Parks Concession and Operating Agreement with Prairie Grove Lions Club at Prairie Grove Battlefield State Park)(Rutledge, Donnie) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2020. Bench Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 21, 2020. (jas) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss by The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.. (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.. (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Thompson on behalf of The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.. (Thompson, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2222195.. (Doty, Dustin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: MICHAEL A. THOMPSON. (tg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/16/2020 (tg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc., filed by Michele Hunt.(tg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc. (tg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-20-1673, filed by The International Association of Lions Clubs Inc.(tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #1 State Court Documents) (tg). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less