This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2023 at 09:16:02 (UTC).

Hunt v. Albertsons Companies Inc

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 Hunt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Albertsons Companies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02886

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joni Hunt

Defendant

Albertsons Companies Inc doing business as Albertsons 4133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matt Aulsbrook

Kimberly Nicole Jones Penepacker

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P Sharp

Robyn M Wise

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Defendant's First Amended Original Answer to Plaintiff'

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's First Amended Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by Albertsons Companies Inc with brief/memorandum in support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Defendant's First Amended Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text per attorney on 2/10/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Discovery Requests filed by Albertsons Companies Inc (Wise, Robyn) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joni Hunt. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten pdf on 2/1/2023) (mms). Modified on 2/1/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#11

(#11) TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning 2/5/2024 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2023) (mlb) Modified text on 1/23/2023 (mlb). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2023. Discovery due by 7/14/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2023. Motions due by 9/1/2023. Status Report due by 7/14/2023. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2023) (mlb) Modified deadline on 1/23/2023 (mlb). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another partys previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2023) (mlb) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT on Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Wise, Robyn) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit(s) A

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/24/2023. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/27/2022) (mcrd) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Defendant's notice of removal, filed 12/22/2022, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of plaintiff Joni Hunt ("Hunt"). No later than 14 days from the date of this order, defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/27/2022) (mcrd) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robyn M Wise on behalf of Albertsons Companies Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sharp, Michael) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's First Amended Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by Albertsons Companies Inc with brief/memorandum in support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Defendant's First Amended Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text per attorney on 2/10/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Discovery Requests filed by Albertsons Companies Inc (Wise, Robyn) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joni Hunt. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten pdf on 2/1/2023) (mms). Modified on 2/1/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning 2/5/2024 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2023) (mlb) Modified text on 1/23/2023 (mlb). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2023. Discovery due by 7/14/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2023. Motions due by 9/1/2023. Status Report due by 7/14/2023. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2023) (mlb) Modified deadline on 1/23/2023 (mlb). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another partys previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2023) (mlb) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT on Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Wise, Robyn) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended Notice of Removal filed by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (sxf). (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/24/2023. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/27/2022) (mcrd) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Defendant's notice of removal, filed 12/22/2022, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of plaintiff Joni Hunt ("Hunt"). No later than 14 days from the date of this order, defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/27/2022) (mcrd) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robyn M Wise on behalf of Albertsons Companies Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wise, Robyn) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sharp, Michael) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13395904) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sharp, Michael) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (mms). (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten pdf on 12/23/2022) (mms). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less