This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:59:55 (UTC).

Hunsucker v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Hunsucker filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Neal B. Biggers and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Neal B. Biggers

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald A. Hunsucker

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joe Morgan Wilson

Attorney at JOE MORGAN WILSON, ATTORNEY

120 North Front Street

Senatobia, MS 38668

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/7/20. (jcm)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/9/2020. (tab) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to U S Marshal for service. (tab) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/7/2020) (tab).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/7/20. (jcm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald A. Hunsucker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #3 EAJA Limited Power of Attorney) (tab) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT,, filed by Donald A. Hunsucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.