This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2021 at 09:04:07 (UTC).

Hunsinger v. Credence Resource Management LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 Hunsinger filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Credence Resource Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Godbey and David L. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01888

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

Referral Judge

David L. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Hunsinger

Dallas, TX 75217

Defendants

Credence Resource Management LLC

The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Charles R Penot, Jr

Attorney at Sessions Israel & Shartle LLC

900 Jackson Street Suite 440

Dallas, TX 75202

Dayle M Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Drive, Suite 195

Tampa, FL 33618

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #3 Complaint,, filed by Credence Resource Management LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND DENYING MOTION AS MOOT: The Court GRANTS Defendant Credence Resource Management LLC's (CRM) #10 second unopposed motion to extend its time to respond to the complaint. This response must now be filed by 10/11/2021. And the Court DENIES AS MOOT CRM's #7 first unopposed motion to extend time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/24/2021) (twd) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Credence Resource Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle M Van Hoose on behalf of Credence Resource Management LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Van Hoose, Dayle) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credence Resource Management LLC. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Credence Resource Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Charles R Penot, Jr added to party Credence Resource Management LLC(pty:dft) (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Credence Resource Management LLC; served on 8/23/2021. (jmg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Credence Resource Management LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hunsinger. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Credence Resource Management LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company filed by Joe Hunsinger. (Filing fee $402.00; Receipt number DS133120) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Judge Godbey has directed through Special Order 3 that a case of this type be referred. Therefore, when you complete this event, the proper referral status will be set and the following flags will appear: CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #3 Complaint,, filed by Credence Resource Management LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND DENYING MOTION AS MOOT: The Court GRANTS Defendant Credence Resource Management LLC's (CRM) #10 second unopposed motion to extend its time to respond to the complaint. This response must now be filed by 10/11/2021. And the Court DENIES AS MOOT CRM's #7 first unopposed motion to extend time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/24/2021) (twd) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Credence Resource Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle M Van Hoose on behalf of Credence Resource Management LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Van Hoose, Dayle) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credence Resource Management LLC. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Credence Resource Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Charles R Penot, Jr added to party Credence Resource Management LLC(pty:dft) (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Credence Resource Management LLC; served on 8/23/2021. (jmg) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Credence Resource Management LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hunsinger. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Credence Resource Management LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company filed by Joe Hunsinger. (Filing fee $402.00; Receipt number DS133120) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Judge Godbey has directed through Special Order 3 that a case of this type be referred. Therefore, when you complete this event, the proper referral status will be set and the following flags will appear: CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDENCE RESOURCE MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles R Penot, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dayle Marie Van Hoose