This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2021 at 16:34:52 (UTC).

HUNDLEY v. SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 HUNDLEY filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are HUGH LAWSON and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUGH LAWSON

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMES HUNDLEY

Oglethorpe, GA 31068

Respondent

WARDEN TARMARSHE SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

PAULA K SMITH

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

CLINT C MALCOLM

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Superior Court documents

1 #2

Envelope

#2

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

2 #2

Envelope

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Envelope

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE RE FILING IN PROPER DIVISION: Your documents were sent to a division other than the division where your case is pending. Although not required, in order to expedite filing we recommend you send documents to the division where your case is pending. Please send all future documents to: U.S. District Court, 401 N. Patterson Street, Suite 212, Valdosta, GA 31601..(sbd) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Motion to Amend) against TARMARSHE SMITH by JAMES HUNDLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CLINT C MALCOLM on behalf of TARMARSHE SMITH (MALCOLM, CLINT) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by TARMARSHE SMITH, #5 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by TARMARSHE SMITH ); Notice to Counsel - Paula K. Smith and Clint C. Malcolm - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please check the telephone numbers to be sure the telephone numbers on the notices are the same as on the docket. Please update your contact information via PACER.(sbd) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CLINT C MALCOLM on behalf of TARMARSHE SMITH Attorney CLINT C MALCOLM added to party TARMARSHE SMITH(pty:res)(MALCOLM, CLINT) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of TARMARSHE SMITH Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party TARMARSHE SMITH(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Petitioner's motion to proceed IFP, providing for amendment, and Directing Service, and ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES HUNDLEY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 4/20/2021. (TQL) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JAMES HUNDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JAMES HUNDLEY. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court documents, #2 Envelope)(rlw) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith