This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 07:16:05 (UTC).

Hundley v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Hundley filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Nicholas P. Mizell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Hundley

Defendants

Upgrade, Inc.

DFS Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank H. Kerney, III

Defendant Attorney

Jacqueline Simms-Petredis

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTICE of settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC by Sandra Hundley (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#28

(#28) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by DFS Services LLC. (Simms-Petredis, Jacqueline) Modified tect on 4/7/2023 (JK). (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 20th, 2023 at 1:30 PM EST before Gregory P. Holder. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#23

(#23) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified text on 3/27/2023 (JK). (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Lead Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#21

(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 02/27/2023 by Sandra Hundley as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to DFS Services LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Upgrade, Inc. (JK) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/24/2023. (JK) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #5

Proposed Summons DFS Services

1 #4

Proposed Summons Upgrade, Inc.

1 #3

Proposed Summons Equifax

1 #2

Proposed Summons Experian

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ENDORSED ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice as to Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC only per the Notice of Settlement. (Doc. #29). If no party files an appropriate paper per Local Rule 3.09(b) on or before May 11, 20203, then this action will be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Upgrade, Inc. only and without further order. This case remains open as to Defendant Discover Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/11/2023. (CMC) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC by Sandra Hundley (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by DFS Services LLC. (Simms-Petredis, Jacqueline) Modified tect on 4/7/2023 (JK). (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 20th, 2023 at 1:30 PM EST before Gregory P. Holder. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 defendant Experian's unopposed motion for more time to respond. The court accepts Experian's answer (Doc. 21) as timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/5/2023. (BB) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified text on 3/27/2023 (JK). (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Lead Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FCRA FAST TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/2/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Simms-Petredis on behalf of DFS Services LLC (Simms-Petredis, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 02/27/2023 by Sandra Hundley as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of service executed on 02/27/2023 by Sandra Hundley as to DFS Services LLC. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 02/27/2023 by Sandra Hundley as to Upgrade, Inc. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 02/27/2023 by Sandra Hundley as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to DFS Services LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Upgrade, Inc. (JK) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/24/2023. (JK) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-00127-SPC-NPM. (APV) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DFS Services LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Upgrade, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20546695) filed by Sandra Hundley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Experian, #3 Proposed Summons Equifax, #4 Proposed Summons Upgrade, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons DFS Services)(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less