This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2022 at 01:28:22 (UTC).

Humphries et al v. Button

Case Summary

On July 28, 2021, Sage Humphries and Gina Menichino (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Lindsey Ruff, Richard J. Pocker, Sabina Mariella, and Sigrid McCawley of Boies Schiller Flexner, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Mitchell Taylor Button (“Defendant”), represented by Alex J. Shepard, Marc Randazza, Ronald D. Green, Jr., of Randazza Legal Group, PLLC, seeking damages for allegedly exploiting his position of power and influence in the dance world to sexually abuse young dancers across the country. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada with Judges Andrew P. Gordon and Cam Ferenbach presiding.

In the complaint, Plaintiffs stated that “Taylor Button became a dance teacher at Centerstage Dance Academy (‘Centerstage’) in Tampa, Florida in approximately 2006. At this time, Taylor was 21 years old and went by the name Taylor Moore.”

Plaintiffs further stated that “Taylor required all students to wear only sports bras and ‘booty shorts’ to his dance classes. Taylor would compliment Gina’s body and appearance. Taylor also became physically affectionate with Gina.”

Plaintiffs also stated that “Taylor made special efforts to isolate Gina and confine her in spaces which he controlled. For example, Taylor scheduled rehearsals for Gina’s dance solos to be late at night when no one else was in the dance studio.”

Plaintiffs alleged that “Taylor forcefully performed oral sex on that minor child and forced her to perform oral sex on him. Among other tactics, Taylor used his position of power and authority over that child to force her to comply with his sexual demands. For instance, Taylor would reward that child with special professional opportunities—including traveling to out-of-state dance conventions—to reward her obedience. Conversely, Taylor would retaliate against that child and threaten to hurt her dance career if she refused his advances.”

Plaintiffs further alleged that “on a second occasion in 2010, when Gina was 13 years old, Gina and Taylor were again watching a movie with other girls from the dance studio and sharing a blanket. Taylor again began rubbing Gina’s vagina and penetrated her with his hand. Taylor then grabbed Gina’s hand and forced her to touch his penis.”

Plaintiffs also alleged that “a substantial portion of this work involves interacting with minors. For instance, the Buttons have been affiliated with the Showstopper, BellaMoxi, and Radix dance conventions and competitions.”

Plaintiffs additionally alleged that “one day in California, the Buttons insisted that they leave Sage’s parent’s house to go to Sage’s family beach house. Sage’s parents protested because they had not seen Sage in a long time and wanted to spend time with her. The Buttons then verbally abused Sage and threatened her career success.”

Plaintiffs presented eight claims for relief alleging violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1595(a), battery, false imprisonment, assault, intentional infliction of emotional distress, reach of fiduciary duty and violation of 18 U.S.C.A. §§ 2255, 2252. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs requested compensatory, consequential, exemplary, and punitive damages along with costs and attorneys’ fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01412

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andrew P. Gordon

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judges

Cam Ferenbach

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Sage Humphries

Gina Menichino

RoseMarie DeAngelo

Danielle Gutierrez

Jane Doe 100

Juliet Doherty

Jane Doe 200

Defendants, Counter Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Mitchell Taylor Button

Dusty Button

3Rd Party Defendants

Michael S. Humphries

Micah L. Humphries

Anthony G. Deane

Daryl A. Katz

Chase Finlay

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lindsey Ruff

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Richard J. Pocker

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

300 South Fourth Street, Suite 800

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Sabina Mariella

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Sigrid McCawley

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

401 East Las Olas Boulevard

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant, Counter Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Randazza

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Ronald D Green, Jr

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Alex J. Shepard

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

63 #1

Exhibit 1 - Redacted Complaint

54 #28

Summons Micah Humphries

54 #23

Exhibit 22 - Dusty Button Declaration

54 #19

Exhibit 18 - Dont Ever Leave Me

54 #15

Exhibit 14 - Snapchat from Sage

54 #13

Exhibit 12 - Message from Sage

54 #9

Exhibit 8 - Message from Sage

54 #7

Exhibit 6 - Sage Messages with Katz

54 #1

Index of Exhibits

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons Mitchell Taylor Button

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

101 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MOTION to Strike #54 Third Party Complaint,,,,,, by Counter Claimants Dusty Button, Mitchell Taylor Button, Third Party Plaintiffs Dusty Button, Mitchell Taylor Button, Defendants Dusty Button, Mitchell Taylor Button. Responses due by 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted LexisNexis Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wikipedia Page, #4 Exhibit 4 - Google Results)(Randazza, Marc) (pleading) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION to Sever Third-Party Claim re #54 Third Party Complaint,,,,,, by Plaintiffs RoseMarie DeAngelo, Jane Doe 100, Jane Doe 200, Juliet Doherty, Danielle Gutierrez, Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino, Third Party Defendants Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries. (claims) Responses due by 8/12/2022. (McCawley, Sigrid) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION to Dismiss #54 Third Party Complaint,,,,,, by Plaintiffs RoseMarie DeAngelo, Jane Doe 100, Jane Doe 200, Juliet Doherty, Danielle Gutierrez, Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino, Third Party Defendants Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries. Responses due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sigrid S. McCawley, #6 Declaration of Micah Humphries, #7 Declaration of Michael Humphries)(McCawley, Sigrid) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard J. Pocker on behalf of Third Party Defendants Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries. (Pocker, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by RoseMarie DeAngelo, Jane Doe 100, Jane Doe 200, Juliet Doherty, Danielle Gutierrez, Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries, Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McCawley, Sigrid) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lindsey Ruff on behalf of Third Party Defendants Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries. (Ruff, Lindsey) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sabina Mariella on behalf of Third Party Defendants Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries. (Mariella, Sabina) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sigrid McCawley on behalf of Third Party Defendants Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries. (McCawley, Sigrid) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony G. Deane, Chase Finlay, Micah L. Humphries, Michael S. Humphries, Daryl A. Katz re #54 Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - M.L. Humphries, #2 Summons Issued - A.G. Deane, #3 Summons Issued - D.A. Katz, #4 Summons Issued - C. Finlay) (CJD) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT and Counterclaim against RoseMarie DeAngelo, Jane Doe 100, Jane Doe 200, Juliet Doherty, Danielle Gutierrez, Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino, Michael S. Humphries, Micah L. Humphries, Anthony G. Deane, Daryl A. Katz, Chase Finlay by Dusty Button, Mitchell Taylor Button. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Screenshots from Video, #3 Exhibit 2 - Photos, #4 Exhibit 3 - Card from Sage to Dusty, #5 Exhibit 4 - Messages from Sage, #6 Exhibit 5 - Photo of Sage Family, #7 Exhibit 6 - Sage Messages with Katz, #8 Exhibit 7 - Messages from Sage re VM, #9 Exhibit 8 - Message from Sage, #10 Exhibit 9 - Message from Sage, #11 Exhibit 10 - Snapchat from Sage, #12 Exhibit 11 - Snapchat from Sage, #13 Exhibit 12 - Message from Sage, #14 Exhibit 13 - Message from Sage, #15 Exhibit 14 - Snapchat from Sage, #16 Exhibit 15 - Message from Sage, #17 Exhibit 16 - Message from Sage, #18 Exhibit 17 - Messages from Sage to Deane, #19 Exhibit 18 - Dont Ever Leave Me, #20 Exhibit 19 - Mr Ferrari, #21 Exhibit 20 - Messages from Sage, #22 Exhibit 21 - Photos with Doherty, #23 Exhibit 22 - Dusty Button Declaration, #24 Exhibit 23 - Mitchell Taylor Button Declaration, #25 Summons Anthony Deane, #26 Summons Chase Finlay, #27 Summons Daryl Katz, #28 Summons Micah Humphries, #29 Summons Michael Humphries) (Randazza, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sigrid E McCawley for Sage Humphries,Sigrid E McCawley for Gina Menichino and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/5/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino re #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued. Mitchell Taylor Button served on 7/29/2021. (Pocker, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Mitchell Taylor Button re #1 Complaint. (YAW) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 8/18/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (YAW) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (YAW) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sabina Mariella and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6574318) by Plaintiffs Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino. (Pocker, Richard) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Ruff and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6574312) by Plaintiffs Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino. (Pocker, Richard) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sigrid S. McCawley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6574306) by Plaintiffs Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino. (Pocker, Richard) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Pocker, Richard) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6574223) by Sage Humphries, Gina Menichino. Proof of service due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mitchell Taylor Button) (Pocker, Richard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Randazza

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex James Shepard