This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:22:24 (UTC).

Humber v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Humber filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna M Manasco. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01420

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna M Manasco

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cassaundra Humber

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Amanda Lane Stansberry

Attorney at STANSBERRY LAW, LLC

3535 Grandview Pkwy #310

Birmingham, AL 35243

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Iwana Rademaekers

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF IWANA RADEMAEKERS PC

17304 Preston Road Suite 800

Dallas, TX 75252

Matthew Robinett

Attorney at NORMAN WOOD KENDRICK & TURNER

Ridge Park Place, Suite 30001130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan via certified US mail. (DNW, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. served on 11/8/2021; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/8/2021. (DNW, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (DNW, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Limited Admission PHV by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cassaundra Humber by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Rademaekers, Iwana) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Toyota Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. and Toyota Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Rademaekers, Iwana) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#10

(#10) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/30/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cassaundra Humber.(Stansberry, Amanda) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rademaekers, Iwana) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rademaekers, Iwana) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cassaundra Humber.(Stansberry, Amanda) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/30/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Toyota Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. and Toyota Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Rademaekers, Iwana) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cassaundra Humber by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Rademaekers, Iwana) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER. Defendant Lincoln National's Motion for Leave as to Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #5 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/18/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3964035 (B4601116997). (Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 11/18/2021 (DNW, ). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Limited Admission PHV by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (DNW, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. served on 11/8/2021; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/8/2021. (DNW, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan via certified US mail. (DNW, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for service by certified mail filed by Cassaundra Humber in the body of the Complaint. (DNW, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3950190 (B4601116536). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendant filed by Cassaundra Humber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DNW). (Stansberry, Amanda) Modified on 10/26/2021 (DNW, ). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendant filed by Cassaundra Humber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DNW) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Robinett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iwana Rademaekers