This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:49:24 (UTC).

Humana Inc. v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Humana Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07934

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Humana Inc.

Defendants

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.

Hikma Labs, Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Lupin Ltd.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Lupin Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Michael Schneider

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Peter St. Phillip

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Noelle Ruggiero

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Uriel Rabinovitz

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, PC

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey E. Faucette

Attorney at Skaggs Faucette LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Heather Marie Burke

Attorney at White and Case LLP

3000 El Camino Real

Jack E. Pace, III

Attorney at White and Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Michael John Shipley

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Nicholas Samuel Goldberg

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPar Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#30

(#30) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Nanomi BV for Lupin Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#29

(#29) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC identifying Other Affiliate TPG Global, LLC, Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#28

(#28) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAmneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley for Defendants Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Lupin Inc. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint #1 and Affirmative Defenses byEurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2021) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Time to Answer filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/21/2021) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/13/2021) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPar Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Nanomi BV for Lupin Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC identifying Other Affiliate TPG Global, LLC, Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAmneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley for Defendants Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Lupin Inc. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint #1 and Affirmative Defenses byEurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke for Defendants Eurohealth (U.S.A.), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., and Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/8/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2021) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2021) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Time to Answer filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/21/2021) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/13/2021) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/22/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16481240.). Filed byHumana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIKMA LABS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Eurohealth (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited is a litigant