This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2022 at 08:34:42 (UTC).

Human Resource Advantage LLC et al v. The Hanover Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Human Resource Advantage LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hanover Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01610

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Human Resource Advantage LLC

Debbie Brownlee

Defendant and Counter Claimant

The Hanover Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

James Hugh Wilkins

Attorney at Wilkins, Drolshagen & Czeshinski

6785 N. Willow Ave.

Fresno, CA 93710

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jordon Edward Harriman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th St., Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Debbie Brownlee, Human Resource Advantage LLC. (Wilkins, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Debbie Brownlee, Human Resource Advantage LLC.(Wilkins, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

3 #5

VDRP

3 #4

Consent Form

3 #3

Clarification Order

3 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

3 #1

Standing Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by The Hanover Insurance Company (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

1 #7

Notice Of Interested Parties

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Debbie Brownlee, Human Resource Advantage LLC. (Wilkins, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Debbie Brownlee, Human Resource Advantage LLC.(Wilkins, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Clarification Order, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by The Hanover Insurance Company (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 21CECG02950 by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9912628) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Notice Of Interested Parties)(Harriman, Jordon) Mod (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY THE(ERRONEOUSLY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordon Edward Harriman