This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 09:29:42 (UTC).

Hultman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Hultman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01936

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Hultman

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathryn Dicus

Attorney at Dicus Disability LLC

10645 N Tatum Blvd., Ste. 329

Phoenix, AZ 85028

Defendant Attorney

Carol Clark

Attorney at Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel

160 Spear St., Ste. 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See attached Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 5, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and may serve the Summons and Complaint by waiver under Rule 4(d). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/20. (EJA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Clark, Carol) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See attached Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 5, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and may serve the Summons and Complaint by waiver under Rule 4(d). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/20. (EJA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1936-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Andrea Hultman. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Andrea Hultman. (Dicus, Kathryn) (DLC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Andrea Hultman. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less