This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2022 at 10:36:09 (UTC).

HUISHA-HUISHA et al v. GAYNOR et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 HUISHA-HUISHA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GAYNOR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H.T.D.S.D.S.

H.N.D.S.

E.R.P.D.S.

I.M.C.H.

M.E.S.D.S.

NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA

JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA

VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO

B.A.M.M.

MARTHA LILIANA TADAY-ACOSTA

T.J.T.-B.

ROMILUS VALCOURT

Amicus Curiae

DEBORAH ANKER

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tamara Goodlette

Arthur B. Spitzer

Cody H. Wofsy

Daniel Antonio Galindo

Karla Vargas

Lee Gelernt

Melissa E. Crow

Ming Cheung

Morgan Russell

Omar C. Jadwat

Scott Michelman

Stephen Bonggyun Kang

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Noah A. Levine

Other Attorneys

Raymond P. Tolentino

Kathryn S. Austin

Geroline A Castillo

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#156

(#156) NOTICE Notice of Filing Certified Index of Amended Administrative Record by XAVIER BECERRA, PETE FLORES, TAE D. JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, RAUL L. ORTIZ, ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#154

(#154) JOINT APPENDIX by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

153 #3

Text of Proposed Order

153 #2

Declaration of Ming Cheung

153 #1

Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment (Re-filed and Redacted)

153 #153

Main Document

152 #2

Declaration of Ming Cheung

152 #1

Memorandum in Support of Classwide Preliminary Injunction (Re-filed and Redacted

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons for all Defendants

1 #2

Notice of Related Cases

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

221 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) NOTICE Notice of Filing Certified Index of Amended Administrative Record by XAVIER BECERRA, PETE FLORES, TAE D. JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, RAUL L. ORTIZ, ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Relevant Administrative Record)(Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) JOINT APPENDIX by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment (Re-filed and Redacted), #2 Declaration of Ming Cheung, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Classwide Preliminary Injunction (Re-filed and Redacted), #2 Declaration of Ming Cheung, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Classwide Preliminary Injunction, #2 Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment)(Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) REPLY to opposition to motion Redacted Reply in Support of Summary Judgment re #144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Gelernt, Lee) Modified on 9/16/2022 to add docket relationship (zed). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Reply in Support of Summary Judgment)(Gelernt, Lee) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Gelernt, Lee) Modified on 9/15/2022 counsel refiled at entry #149 (zjm). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) Memorandum in opposition to re #144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by XAVIER BECERRA, PETE FLORES, TAE D. JOHNSON, CHRIS MAGNUS, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, RAUL L. ORTIZ, ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
255 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting, over objection, Plaintiffs' #5 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. In view of the arguments presented by Plaintiffs in their motion, the representations made by the Government, and for the reasons stated on the record at the January 12, 2021 Status Conference, Plaintiffs shall not be involuntarily removed from the United States pending further order of the Court. Parties shall file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by no later than January 15, 2021. In the forthcoming briefing, in addition to other arguments, parties shall address whether this case is related to Civil Action Number 20-2245, P.J.E.S. v. Wolf Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/12/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held via VTC on 1/12/2021. The Court Will Grant Motion Over Objection. Plaintiffs Not Involuntarily Moved Pending Further Order Of The Court. The Court Will Issue An Order. Parties Will Confer In Regard To Briefing Schedule. (Court Reporter LISA BANKINS.) (mac) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 6:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a Status Conference for January 12, 2021 at 6:00 PM via Teleconference. The parties shall contact Mr. Mark Coates, the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, for the dial-in information. In view of Plaintiffs' #5 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal, plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/12/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, #2 Declaration of Andrea Meza, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Huisha-Huisha, #2 Declaration of Pereira-De Souza, #3 Declaration of Macancela Bermejo, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, JONATHAN FAHEY, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, PETER T. GAYNOR, MARK A. MORGAN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA. Case related to Case No. 20cv2245. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, JONATHAN FAHEY, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, PETER T. GAYNOR, MARK A. MORGAN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8066168) filed by B.A.M.M., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., I.M.C.H., JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA, E.R.P.D.S., M.E.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Cases, #3 Summons for all Defendants)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less