This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2021 at 11:17:24 (UTC).

HUISHA-HUISHA et al v. GAYNOR et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 HUISHA-HUISHA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GAYNOR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H.T.D.S.D.S.

H.N.D.S.

E.R.P.D.S.

I.M.C.H.

M.E.S.D.S.

NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA

JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA

VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO

B.A.M.M.

MARTHA LILIANA TADAY-ACOSTA

T.J.T.-B.

ROMILUS VALCOURT

Defendants

PETER T. GAYNOR

ROBERT R. REDFIELD

RODNEY S. SCOTT

WILLIAM A. FERRARA

JONATHAN FAHEY

ALEX M. AZAR, II

MARK A. MORGAN

Amicus Curiae

DEBORAH ANKER

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Celso Perez

Attorney at ACLU IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Arthur B. Spitzer

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

915 15Th Street Nw, Ste 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Scott Michelman

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

915 15Th Street, Nw, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Omar C. Jadwat

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Jamie L. Crook

Attorney at CENTER FOR GENDER AND REFUGEE STUDIES

200 Mcallister Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Morgan Russell

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cody H. Wofsy

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel Antonio Galindo

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

125 Broad Street, 125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Stephen Bonggyun Kang

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Lee Gelernt

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Ming Cheung

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorney

Sean Michael Tepe

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Noah A. Levine

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwhich Street

New York, NY 10007

Paul R.Q. Wolfson

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, Suite 400E

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Raymond P. Tolentino

Attorney at KAPLAN HECKER & FINK LLP

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110

New York, NY 10118

Kathryn S. Austin

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

One Battery Park Plaza, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Geroline A Castillo

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

One Battery Park Plaza, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#92

(#92) NOTICE of Appearance by Geroline A Castillo on behalf of INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Castillo, Geroline) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#91

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#87

(#87) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Class Certification and Preliminary Injunction Motions by NORRIS COCHRAN, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, TAE D. JOHNSON, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, TROY MILLER, RODNEY S. SCOTT, ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#90

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

85 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#85

MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting over objection #85 Emergency Motion to Stay Removal. In view of the arguments presented by Plaintiffs in their motion, the Court's February 1, 2021 Minute Order, and for the reasons stated on the record at the January 12, 2021 Status Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the removal of the following family is STAYED pending further order of this Court: Bebeto Pierrot, SID 369-772-300, Nadine Remilus, SID 369-772-363, and their minor child M.A.P., SID 369-868-214. This Order is subject to reconsideration for good cause shown by no later than February 22, 2021 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/22/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Declaration of Andrea Meza

#5

MINUTE ORDER granting, over objection, Plaintiffs' #5 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. In view of the arguments presented by Plaintiffs in their motion, the representations made by the Government, and for the reasons stated on the record at the January 12, 2021 Status Conference, Plaintiffs shall not be involuntarily removed from the United States pending further order of the Court. Parties shall file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by no later than January 15, 2021. In the forthcoming briefing, in addition to other arguments, parties shall address whether this case is related to Civil Action Number 20-2245, P.J.E.S. v. Wolf Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/12/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, JONATHAN FAHEY, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, PETER T. GAYNOR, MARK A. MORGAN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA. Case related to Case No. 20cv2245. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #3

Summons for all Defendants

1 #2

Notice of Related Cases

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, JONATHAN FAHEY, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, PETER T. GAYNOR, MARK A. MORGAN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8066168) filed by B.A.M.M., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., I.M.C.H., JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA, E.R.P.D.S., M.E.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Cases, #3 Summons for all Defendants)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE of Appearance by Geroline A Castillo on behalf of INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Castillo, Geroline) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ENTERED IN ERROR AS A DUPLICATE DE#90 ..SEALED Declaration of Bebeto Pierrot filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf) Modified on 2/26/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Their Motions For Class Certification And Preliminary Injunction due by 3/23/2021. (mac) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #87 joint motion to hold in abeyance Plaintiffs' motions for class certification and classwide preliminary injunction. It is FURTHER ORDERED that either party may request termination of the abeyance by filing a motion seeking such relief. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motions for class certification and preliminary injunction by no later than March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/23/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Hold in Abeyance Plaintiffs' Class Certification and Preliminary Injunction Motions by NORRIS COCHRAN, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, TAE D. JOHNSON, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, TROY MILLER, RODNEY S. SCOTT, ROCHELLE P. WALENSKY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) SEALED DOCUMENT (Declaration of Bebeto Pierrot) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motion For Reconsideration due no later than 3:00PM on 2/22/2021. (mac) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #86 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/22/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting over objection #85 Emergency Motion to Stay Removal. In view of the arguments presented by Plaintiffs in their motion, the Court's February 1, 2021 Minute Order, and for the reasons stated on the record at the January 12, 2021 Status Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the removal of the following family is STAYED pending further order of this Court: Bebeto Pierrot, SID 369-772-300, Nadine Remilus, SID 369-772-363, and their minor child M.A.P., SID 369-868-214. This Order is subject to reconsideration for good cause shown by no later than February 22, 2021 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/22/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Bebeto Pierrot)(Russell, Morgan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting, over objection, Plaintiffs' #5 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. In view of the arguments presented by Plaintiffs in their motion, the representations made by the Government, and for the reasons stated on the record at the January 12, 2021 Status Conference, Plaintiffs shall not be involuntarily removed from the United States pending further order of the Court. Parties shall file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by no later than January 15, 2021. In the forthcoming briefing, in addition to other arguments, parties shall address whether this case is related to Civil Action Number 20-2245, P.J.E.S. v. Wolf Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/12/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held via VTC on 1/12/2021. The Court Will Grant Motion Over Objection. Plaintiffs Not Involuntarily Moved Pending Further Order Of The Court. The Court Will Issue An Order. Parties Will Confer In Regard To Briefing Schedule. (Court Reporter LISA BANKINS.) (mac) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 6:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a Status Conference for January 12, 2021 at 6:00 PM via Teleconference. The parties shall contact Mr. Mark Coates, the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, for the dial-in information. In view of Plaintiffs' #5 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal, plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/12/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal, #2 Declaration of Andrea Meza, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Huisha-Huisha, #2 Declaration of Pereira-De Souza, #3 Declaration of Macancela Bermejo, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, JONATHAN FAHEY, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, PETER T. GAYNOR, MARK A. MORGAN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by B.A.M.M., E.R.P.D.S., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, I.M.C.H., M.E.S.D.S., VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO, JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA. Case related to Case No. 20cv2245. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, JONATHAN FAHEY, WILLIAM A. FERRARA, PETER T. GAYNOR, MARK A. MORGAN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8066168) filed by B.A.M.M., H.N.D.S., H.T.D.S.D.S., I.M.C.H., JOSAINE PEREIRA-DE SOUZA, E.R.P.D.S., M.E.S.D.S., NANCY GIMENA HUISHA-HUISHA, VALERIA MACANCELA BERMEJO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Cases, #3 Summons for all Defendants)(Perez, Celso) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond P. Tolentino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geroline A Castillo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin