This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2019 at 08:12:00 (UTC).

Hugueley v. Parker et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Hugueley filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Parker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00598

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Hugueley

Defendants

Michael Keys

Tony Mays

Tony Parker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Savage Davidson

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorneys

Charlotte M. Davis

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P O Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Robert W. Mitchell

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P O Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (INITIAL) filed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

15 #3

Exhibit 3 - August 30 2019 Email Correspondence

15 #2

Exhibit 2 - CV of Dr. Stuart Grassian

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - Hathaway CV

#15

(#15) Emergency MOTION For Independent Medical and Psychiatric Evaluations by Stephen Hugueley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hathaway CV, #2 Exhibit 2 - CV of Dr. Stuart Grassian, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 30 2019 Email Correspondence)(Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 11, 2019 at 3:45 p.m. is hereby RESET for the same day at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2019. (jw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#13

(#13) MEMORDANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant Parker is DISMISSED from this action. To the extent that the plaintiff intended to raise an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs based on the allegedly deficient medical or psychiatric treatment he has received, that discrete claim is DISMISSED. Any claims for money damages against the defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker.(Davis, Charlotte) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons issued as to Tony Parker (in his individual capacity). (jw) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jw). (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. Michael Keys served on 7/17/2019. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. Tony Mays served on 7/17/2019. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Brief - Porter v. Clarke

1 #2

Exhibit A - Level Reviews

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2951225), filed by Stephen Hugueley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Level Reviews, #3 Exhibit B - Brief - Porter v. Clarke)(jw) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (INITIAL) filed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Emergency MOTION For Independent Medical and Psychiatric Evaluations by Stephen Hugueley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hathaway CV, #2 Exhibit 2 - CV of Dr. Stuart Grassian, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 30 2019 Email Correspondence)(Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 11, 2019 at 3:45 p.m. is hereby RESET for the same day at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2019. (jw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORDANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant Parker is DISMISSED from this action. To the extent that the plaintiff intended to raise an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs based on the allegedly deficient medical or psychiatric treatment he has received, that discrete claim is DISMISSED. Any claims for money damages against the defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/16/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Charlotte M. Davis and Robert W. Mitchell. (jw) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker.(Davis, Charlotte) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons issued as to Tony Parker (in his individual capacity). (jw) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jw). (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. Michael Keys served on 7/17/2019. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. Tony Mays served on 7/17/2019. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS returned executed by Stephen Hugueley. Tony Parker served on 7/17/2019. (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 3:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons issued as to Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker. Service copies at intake for pickup by counsel. (jw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Savage Davidson. (jw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Keys, Tony Mays, Tony Parker (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2951225), filed by Stephen Hugueley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Level Reviews, #3 Exhibit B - Brief - Porter v. Clarke)(jw) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Savage Davidson