This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:15:42 (UTC).

Hughes v. Thrivent Financial for Lutherans

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Hughes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Thrivent Financial for Lutherans. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessie W. Hughes

Defendant

Thrivent Financial for Lutherans

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harry Ingleson, II

Attorney at Law Offices of Daniel J. Harris, P.C.

410 Petoskey St.

Petoskey, MI 49770

Defendant Attorneys

Jesse Louis Roth

Attorney at Maddin, Hauser, Roth & Heller, P.C.

28400 Northwestern Hwy., 2Nd Fl.

Southfield, MI 48034

Kathleen H. Klaus

Attorney at Maddin Hauser Wartell Roth & Heller PC

28400 Northwestern Hwy., 2Nd Fl.

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/9/2019 at 02:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 7/3/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/26/2019 at 11:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 6/21/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Jessie W. Hughes (Ingleson, Harry) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/8/2020; dispositive motions due by 2/7/2020; settlement conference set for 6/17/2020 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 9/1/2020 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#9

(#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Ingleson, Harry) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with Exhibits 1 & 2) from Emmet County Probate Court case number 13-013712-DE filed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference; CMO to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans re Notice of Removal #1 (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/8/2020; dispositive motions due by 2/7/2020; settlement conference set for 6/17/2020 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 9/1/2020 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference; CMO to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Ingleson, Harry) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kathleen H. Klaus on behalf of defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Klaus, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Jessie W. Hughes (Ingleson, Harry) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Harry Ingleson, II on behalf of plaintiff Jessie W. Hughes (Ingleson, Harry) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/9/2019 at 02:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 7/3/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/26/2019 at 11:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 6/21/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4443676 (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans re Notice of Removal #1 (Roth, Jesse) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with Exhibits 1 & 2) from Emmet County Probate Court case number 13-013712-DE filed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.