This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:14:00 (UTC).

HUGHES v. FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by HUGHES against FORSTER, GARBUS GARBUS in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17098

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Joseph A. Dickson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILENA M. HUGHES

Defendants

FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

JOHN DOES 1 to 10

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MILENA M. HUGHES. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (KIM, YONGMOON) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS, JOHN DOES 1 to 10, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9914057) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MILENA M. HUGHES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KIM, YONGMOON) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MILENA M. HUGHES. FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (KIM, YONGMOON) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MILENA M. HUGHES. FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (KIM, YONGMOON) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MILENA M. HUGHES. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (KIM, YONGMOON) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FORSTER, GARBUS & GARBUS, JOHN DOES 1 to 10, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9914057) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MILENA M. HUGHES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KIM, YONGMOON) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.