This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2020 at 07:06:29 (UTC).

Hughes v. EDS Service Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Hughes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against EDS Service Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04229

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shade Hughes

Defendant

EDS Service Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rhett Thomas Francisco

15760 Ventura Blvd., Suite 700

Encino, CA 91436

Daniel J. Friedman

Attorney at Employee Justice Legal Group

3055 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Kaveh S. Elihu

Attorney at Employee Justice Legal Group

3055 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Pizzo Frenzen

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

Lisa Barnett Sween

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Supplement Correct Letter San Mateo Superior Court

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Standing Order

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Amy P. Frenzen

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT By San Mateo Superior Court as to #12 Clerks Notice of Remand. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Letter of Remand: Certified copies of Order Granting Stipulation and Docket mailed to Superior Court of San Mateo County. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2020: #1 Supplement Correct Letter San Mateo Superior Court) (msrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Stipulation to Remand. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shade Hughes.. (Francisco, Rhett) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Remand filed by EDS Service Solutions, LLC. (Frenzen, Amy) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/24/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by EDS Service Solutions, LLC.. (Frenzen, Amy) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by EDS Service Solutions, LLC (Sween, Lisa) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by EDS Service Solutions, LLC (Sween, Lisa) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EDS Service Solutions, LLC re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Removal Complaint (Frenzen, Amy) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Removal Complaint (See Notice of Removal, Exhibit C) byEDS Service Solutions, LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-02214. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14622932). Filed byEDS Service Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Griselda Botello, #2 Declaration of Amy P. Frenzen, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frenzen, Amy) (Filed on 6/25/2020) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDS Service Solutions, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Jeffrey Friedman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaveh Sam Elihu