This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:01:29 (UTC).

Huffman v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Huffman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-07408

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Huffman

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Brooks Sabb Veggian

Attorney at The Cardoza Law Corporation

548 Market Street, #80495

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael Frederick Cardoza

Attorney at The Cardoza Law Corporation

548 Market St. No. 80594

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Kelsey Christine Davidson

Attorney at Jones Day

555 California St., 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Arjun P. Rao

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3086

Cristina Anastassia Guido

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Huffman. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#17

(#17) Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#16

(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint byJPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun P. Rao (Rao, Arjun) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#11

(#11) Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Scott Huffman. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13872474). Filed by Scott Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Christine Davidson for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Scott Huffman. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/3/2019) Modified on 12/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Huffman. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Huffman re #1 Complaint, page 28 (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/14/2019) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

4 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Huffman. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint byJPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun P. Rao (Rao, Arjun) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Scott Huffman. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Christine Davidson for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Scott Huffman. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/3/2019) Modified on 12/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Huffman. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Huffman re #1 Complaint, page 28 (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/14/2019) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Certificate of Interested Entities Must be Filed Separately. Event can be Located Under Notices. This portion of the filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file ONLY the Certificate of Interested Entities. Re: #1 Complaint, page 28, filed by Scott Huffman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/8/2019) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13872474). Filed by Scott Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.