This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/26/2020 at 08:02:21 (UTC).

Huey v. Ouachita Correctional Center et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Huey filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ouachita Correctional Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01531

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamie Wayne Huey

Monroe, LA 71202

Defendants

Cpt Cambel

Warden Johnson

Ricky Martin

Ouachita Correctional Center

Sgt Renfro

 

Court Documents

3 #1

IFP application

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/2/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cambel, Johnson, Ricky Martin, Ouachita Correctional Center, Renfro filed by Jamie Wayne Huey. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,MiletelloSld, A) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/2/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cambel, Johnson, Ricky Martin, Ouachita Correctional Center, Renfro filed by Jamie Wayne Huey. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,MiletelloSld, A) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ouachita Correctional Center is a litigant