This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 10:07:04 (UTC).

Hudson v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Hudson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Alabama INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerusha T. Adams and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kenyatta Hudson

Brent, AL 35034

Kenyatta K. Hudson El

Brent, AL 35034

Defendants

Jimmy Thomas

Steven T. Marshall

State of Alabama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Kristi Oggs Wilkerson

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #1

Exhibit Q - Original sentencing order

#13

#12

11 #16

Exhibit P - Trial court's judgment and sentencing order, CC-12-470

11 #15

Exhibit O - Hudson's petition for writ of certiorari to the Alabama Supreme

11 #14

Exhibit N - Hudson's application for rehearing, CR-18-0707

11 #13

Exhibit M - Court of Criminal Appeals's memorandum opinion on return to rem

11 #12

Exhibit L - Hudson's reply brief on return to remand, CR-18-0707

11 #11

Exhibit K - State's brief on return to remand, CR-18-0707

11 #9

Exhibit I - Certified record on return to remand, third supplemental, CR-18-0707

11 #8

Exhibit H - Court of Criminal Appeals's remand order, CR-18-0707

11 #6

Exhibit F - State's brief, CR-18-0707

11 #3

Exhibit C - First supplemental record on appeal, CR-18-0707

11 #2

Exhibit B - Certified record on appeal, CR-18-0707

11 #1

Exhibit A - Court of Criminal Appeals's docket sheet, CR-18-0707

1 #1

11th Circuit Court of Appeals Petition

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 5/4/2021, Petitioner may file a response to Respondents' #13 Supplemental Answer, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/14/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Supplemental ANSWER to Complaint (Response to Order) by Steven T. Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q - Original sentencing order)(Wilkerson, Kristi) Modified on 4/14/2021 (am, ). (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: DIRECTING that by 4/14/2021, Respondents shall file a supplemental answer, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/26/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven T. Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court of Criminal Appeals's docket sheet, CR-18-0707, #2 Exhibit B - Certified record on appeal, CR-18-0707, #3 Exhibit C - First supplemental record on appeal, CR-18-0707, #4 Exhibit D - Second supplemental record on appeal, CR-18-0707, #5 Exhibit E - Hudson's brief, CR-18-0707, #6 Exhibit F - State's brief, CR-18-0707, #7 Exhibit G - Hudson's reply brief, CR-18-0707, #8 Exhibit H - Court of Criminal Appeals's remand order, CR-18-0707, #9 Exhibit I - Certified record on return to remand, third supplemental, CR-18-0707, #10 Exhibit J - Hudson's brief on return to remand, CR-18-0707, #11 Exhibit K - State's brief on return to remand, CR-18-0707, #12 Exhibit L - Hudson's reply brief on return to remand, CR-18-0707, #13 Exhibit M - Court of Criminal Appeals's memorandum opinion on return to remand, CR-18-0707, #14 Exhibit N - Hudson's application for rehearing, CR-18-0707, #15 Exhibit O - Hudson's petition for writ of certiorari to the Alabama Supreme Court, No. 1190731, #16 Exhibit P - Trial court's judgment and sentencing order, CC-12-470)(Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING the #9 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for Respondents to file their answer is extended to 3/26/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/15/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steven T. Marshall, State of Alabama, Jimmy Thomas. (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Oggs Wilkerson on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Jimmy Thomas (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, & #4 Order signed by Sandra Blackmon for Steven T. Marshall served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Order signed by C. Sanders for Jimmy Thomas served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 3/19/2021; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Jimmy Thomas & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/26/2021. (wcl, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/26/2021. (wcl, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kenyatta Hudson. (es, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenyatta Hudson. (Attachments: #1 11th Circuit Court of Appeals Petition)(es, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi O Wilkerson