This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:46:35 (UTC).

Hudson Specialty Insurance Company v. Walker Telecom, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Hudson Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Walker Telecom, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hudson Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Black Gap, LLC

Jennifer Walker, Clayton Walker, Individually, and D/B/A Walker Construction

Plains Pipeline, L.P.

Steve Henrikson

Walker Telcom, Inc.

Halo Compressor Solutions, LLC

Nancy Henrikson

Jennifer Walker

Clayton Walker

Clayton Walker Individually, and d/b/a Walker Construction

Jennifer Walker Individually, and d/b/a Walker Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Clay Wilkerson

Attorney at Brown Sims

1177 West Loop South, 10Th Floor

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Steve Henrikson. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Nancy Henrikson. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Halo Compressor Solutions, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Plains Pipeline, L.P.. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE Original Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Steve Henrikson. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Nancy Henrikson. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Halo Compressor Solutions, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company as to Plains Pipeline, L.P.. Waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (see) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13356495), filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company. At the direction of the Clerk's Office, Complaint was filed by attorney of record as a Notice due to issues attorney was having with pay.gov program. (kc) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE Original Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkerson, David) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plains Pipeline, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Clay Wilkerson PHV