Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2019 at 07:31:50 (UTC).

Huddleston v. South Carolina Department of Social Services et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Huddleston filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against South Carolina Department of Social Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00541

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Huddleston

Defendants

Samaiyah White

South Carolina Department of Social Services

Tyrea S Wilson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel K Allen

Attorney at Allen and Associates

1417 Ashley River Road

Charleston, SC 29407

Ellen H Babb

Attorney at Babb Law Firm

270 W Coleman Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie N Ramia

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers

Po Box 993

Charleston, SC 29402

Wilbur Eugene Johnson

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers

Po Box 993

Charleston, SC 29402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order Amended Conference and Scheduling Order

#10

(#10) Rule 26(f) Report by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Conference and Scheduling Order)(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Phillip Huddleston.(Allen, Samuel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/17/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/22/2019, Discovery due by 9/16/2019, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 9/30/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 1/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/18/2019. (sshe, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Phillip Huddleston.(Allen, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to extension signed by counsel for Plaintiff on 2-26-19

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson. Response to Motion due by 3/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to extension signed by counsel for Plaintiff on 2-26-19)No proposed order.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson.(sshe, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-00301. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8285189), filed by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Tyrea S Wilson, Samaiyah White. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Rule 26(f) Report by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Conference and Scheduling Order)(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Phillip Huddleston.(Allen, Samuel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/17/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/22/2019, Discovery due by 9/16/2019, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 9/30/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 1/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/18/2019. (sshe, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Phillip Huddleston.(Allen, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until 3/15/2019 to Answer or file other responsive pleading. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/5/2019.(ltap, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson. Response to Motion due by 3/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to extension signed by counsel for Plaintiff on 2-26-19)No proposed order.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Samaiyah White, Tyrea S Wilson.(sshe, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-00301. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8285189), filed by South Carolina Department of Social Services, Tyrea S Wilson, Samaiyah White. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Carolina Department of Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilbur Eugene Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie N Ramia