This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 07:40:40 (UTC).

Huckins v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Huckins filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anne Huckins

Defendants

Life Insurance Company of North America/Cigna Group Insurance

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher G. Roundy

Attorney at Roundy Law Offices PA

52 Littleworth Rd

Dover, NH 03820

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America by Anne Huckins. Served/Mailed on 2/5/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Roundy, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

4 #2

ERISA Notice

4 #1

Notice ECF

#4

(#4) Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(bt) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#3

(#3) ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(bt) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

2 #1

Summons - Waiver

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Anne Huckins (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Roundy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #3

Summons - Waiver

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1760755 filed by Anne Huckins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Roundy, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #4 CORRECTED complaint) (bt). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America by Anne Huckins. Served/Mailed on 2/5/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Roundy, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(bt) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(bt) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-75-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Anne Huckins (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Roundy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1760755 filed by Anne Huckins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Roundy, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #4 CORRECTED complaint) (bt). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.