This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:46:37 (UTC).

Hubbard v. Cowabunga Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Hubbard filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Cowabunga Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01881

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garrett Hubbard

Defendants

Wesley Stearns

R&E Pizza LLC

Cowabunga Inc

Cowabunga Inc d/b/a Domino's, a foreign corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nancy L Eady

Attorney at MORRIS, HAYNES, WHEELES, KNOWLES & NELSON

131 Main Street, Po Box 1660

Alexander City, AL 35011

Taylor Alan Pharr

Attorney at MORRIS HAYNES WHEELES KNOWLES & NELSON LLP

131 Main Street, Po Box 1660

Alexander City, AL 35010

Defendant Attorneys

Hayden Ford Bashinski

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Brett A Ross

Attorney at CARR ALLISON PC

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cowabunga Inc. (Bashinski, Hayden) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

8 #1

Appendix II

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: All Discovery ends 8/3/2020. Telephone Conference set for 8/4/2020 01:30 PM. Dispositive Motions due 9/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix II)(SRD) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ross, Brett) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 12/17/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Cowabunga Inc.(Ross, Brett) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cowabunga Inc. filed by Cowabunga Inc (Ross, Brett) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cowabunga Inc from Circuit Court of St Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-cv-2019-900186, filed by Cowabunga Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hayden Ford Bashinski terminated. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/15/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cowabunga Inc. (Bashinski, Hayden) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: All Discovery ends 8/3/2020. Telephone Conference set for 8/4/2020 01:30 PM. Dispositive Motions due 9/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix II)(SRD) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • (#7) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday 1/14/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Corey L. Maze. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/3/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ross, Brett) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 12/17/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Cowabunga Inc.(Ross, Brett) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cowabunga Inc. filed by Cowabunga Inc (Ross, Brett) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3481958 (ALND B4601102175) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cowabunga Inc from Circuit Court of St Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-cv-2019-900186, filed by Cowabunga Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Ross, Brett) Modified on 11/21/2019 (KEK). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cowabunga Inc from Circuit Court of St Clair County, Alabama, case number 59-cv-2019-900186, filed by Cowabunga Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cowabunga Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DOMINO'S is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hayden Ford Bashinski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett A Ross