This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:41:17 (UTC).

Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Huawei Technologies Co Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Verizon Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC

Verizon Business Global, LLC

Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.

Verizon Communications, Inc.

Verizon Data Services LLC

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc.

Verizon Services Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Wayne Caldwell

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

John Austin Curry

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Justin Thomas Nemunaitis

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Gregory Phillip Love

Attorney at Love Law Firm PC

P.O. Box 948 (Henderson, Tx 75653), 107 East Main Street

Henderson, TX 75652

Jason Dodd Cassady

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Steven Mark Geiszler

Attorney at Futurewei Technologies, Inc

5340 Legacy Drive, Suite 175

Plano, TX 75024

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Deepa Acharya

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - Washington

1300 I Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Brian E Mack

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Charles Kramer Verhoeven

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Patrick Curran

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP - NY

51 Madison Ave, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. by Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deepa Acharya on behalf of All Defendants (Acharya, Deepa) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian E Mack on behalf of All Defendants (Mack, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Curran on behalf of All Defendants (Curran, Patrick) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven on behalf of All Defendants (Verhoeven, Charles) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Data Services LLC to 3/30/2020; Verizon Business Network Services, Inc. to 3/30/2020; Verizon Business Global, LLC to 3/30/2020; Verizon Communications, Inc. to 3/30/2020; Verizon Services Corp. to 3/30/2020; Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC to 3/30/2020; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc. to 3/30/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc., Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Services Corp..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Curry, John) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc., Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Inc., Verizon Business Global, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC, Verizon Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Verizon Services Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7648387.), filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Services Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Data Services LLC is a litigant