This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 08:59:05 (UTC).

Huang v. Computer Connection Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Huang filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Computer Connection Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hildy Bowbeer and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01988

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xiaohua Huang

Los Gatos, CA 95031

Defendant

Computer Connection Corporation

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Envelope

6 #1

Cover Letter

#6

(#6) REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. Computer Connection Corporation served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

3 #1

AO 120 Form

#3

(#3) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Huang enclosing AO 120 form. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form)(NAH) cc: Huang. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (NAH). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Computer Connection Corporation. (NAH) cc: Huang w/ Service Info Sheet. Modified text on 9/17/2020 (NAH). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #7

Envelope

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Cover Letter

1 #4

Exhibit(s) T

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Computer Connection Corporation (filing fee $400, receipt number 44641108671) filed by Xiaohua Huang. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) T, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Envelope) (NAH). Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (MTP). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. Computer Connection Corporation served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Huang enclosing AO 120 form. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form)(NAH) cc: Huang. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (NAH). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Computer Connection Corporation. (NAH) cc: Huang w/ Service Info Sheet. Modified text on 9/17/2020 (NAH). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Computer Connection Corporation (filing fee $400, receipt number 44641108671) filed by Xiaohua Huang. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) T, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Envelope) (NAH). Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (MTP). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less