This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:14:29 (UTC).

Huang et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Huang against Monsanto Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05304

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stacey Johnson

Brian Huang

Defendant

Monsanto Company

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Brian Huang, Stacey Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Webb, Seth) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02120. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7349086, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Brian Huang, Stacey Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Webb, Seth) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

2 #1

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

6 #1

*Restricted*

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri, 4:19-cv-02120, Huang et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as CV 19-5304 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #4 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02120. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Seth S. Webb. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (MFG) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Brian Huang, Stacey Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Webb, Seth) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7349086, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Brian Huang, Stacey Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Webb, Seth) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less