This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2020 at 08:35:44 (UTC).

Hrycak v. Saul

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Hrycak filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00472

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taras C. Hrycak

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Enterline

Attorney at Paul G. Enterline, Esq.

113 South Race Street, P.O. Box 826

Georgetown, DE 19947

Defendant Attorney

Heather Benderson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19101

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to Attorney General of the United States on 4/3/2020, The General Counsel on 4/3/2020, and US Attorney for the District of Delaware on 4/3/2020. Please complete the form and print out for use/service. (Attachments: #1 Summons form, #2 Summons form) (lak) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2892949.) - filed by Taras C. Hrycak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less