This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 09:40:32 (UTC).

Hrncir v. American Express et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2019 Hrncir filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against American Express. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01355

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harlan Hrncir

Defendants

Equifax Information Services LLC

American Express

Transunion, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Zemel

Attorney at Zemel Law LLC

1373 Broad Street, Suite 203-C

Clifton, NJ 07013

Defendant Attorneys

Forrest Mathew Seger, III

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2301 Broadway St.

San Antonio, TX 78215

Brittany Nicole Vanek

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Baco LLP

600 Travis, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Justin Kristopher Sauls

Attorney at Quilling Selander et al

6900 N Dallas Pkwy, Ste 800

Plano, TX 75024

Diane LaRue Myers

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Rebecca Wernicke Anthony

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood St, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time, #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time, #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time, #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time; Answer due for American Express 6/27/2019; Equifax Information Services LLC 6/27/2019; Transunion, LLC 6/19/2019.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Equifax, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC, filed.(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Wernicke Anthony on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed. (Anthony, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Express, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Transunion, LLC, filed.(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed.(Myers, Diane) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed.(Myers, Diane) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transunion, LLC, filed.(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Transunion, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Express, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22233128) filed by Harlan Hrncir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER GRANTING #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time, #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time, #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time, #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time; Answer due for American Express 6/27/2019; Equifax Information Services LLC 6/27/2019; Transunion, LLC 6/19/2019.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Equifax, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC, filed.(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Wernicke Anthony on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed. (Anthony, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Express, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Transunion, LLC, filed.(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed.(Myers, Diane) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed.(Myers, Diane) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transunion, LLC, filed.(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Transunion, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Express, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 7/19/2019 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22233128) filed by Harlan Hrncir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant