This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 07:27:39 (UTC).

Hristozov et al v. Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Hristozov filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11985

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grigor Hristozov

Karolina Hristova

Defendants

Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc.

Denise Page

Frank J Pellegrino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erik Hammarlund

Attorney at Hammarlund Law Office

P.O. Box 2487, 10 State Rd. Unit B-3

Vineyard Haven, MA 02568

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J. Gambaccini

Attorney at Reardon, Joyce & Akerson, P.C.

4 Lancaster Terrace

Worcester, MA 01609

Austin M. Joyce

Attorney at Reardon, Joyce & Akerson, P.C.

4 Lancaster Terrace

Worcester, MA 01609

John M. Collins

Attorney at Collins & Weinberg

47 Memorial Drive

Shrewsbury, MA 01545

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Process in Superior Court

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Frank J Pellegrino, and Denise Page - Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7885881 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Denise Page. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Process in Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet United States District Court Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit United States District Court Case Category Form)(Gambaccini, Andrew) Modified on 9/19/2019 as case was incorrectly filed as a Complaint.(Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc..(Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Denise Page. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Frank J. Pellegrino. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Collins on behalf of Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. (Collins, John) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit United States District Court Case Category Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet United States District Court Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Grigor Hristozov, Karolina Hristova. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Hammarlund, Erik) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#5

(#5) STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Gambaccini, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

4 #1

Affidavit Certificate of Service

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. for Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc... (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Seafood Shanty Restaurant Mgmt., Inc.. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Superior Court Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. for Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc... (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Collins on behalf of Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. (Collins, John) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Seafood Shanty Restaurant Mgmt., Inc.. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Frank J. Pellegrino. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Denise Page. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc..(Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Denise Page, Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc. (Joyce, Austin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Gambaccini, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Grigor Hristozov, Karolina Hristova. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Hammarlund, Erik) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#3) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Frank J Pellegrino, and Denise Page - Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7885881 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Frank J Pellegrino, Seafood Shanty Restaurant Management, Inc., Denise Page. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Process in Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet United States District Court Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit United States District Court Case Category Form)(Gambaccini, Andrew) Modified on 9/19/2019 as case was incorrectly filed as a Complaint.(Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.