This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:31:56 (UTC).

Hoyland v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Hoyland filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Camille D Bibles and Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00730

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Camille D Bibles

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Hoyland

Defendants

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell G Petti

Attorney at Law Offices of Russell G Petti

466 Foothill Blvd., Ste. 389

La Canada, CA 91011

John C Breslo

Attorney at Breslo Law Firm

9375 E Shea Blvd., Ste. 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20606760. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00730-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summons

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 7/28/2022. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and unless the Court orders otherwise, on 7/28/2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/16/2022. (RMW) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 7/28/2022. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and unless the Court orders otherwise, on 7/28/2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/16/2022. (RMW) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-00730-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#7) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Russell G Petti on behalf of Plaintiff Donald Hoyland. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Donald Hoyland. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20606760. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00730-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Donald Hoyland. (Breslo, John) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20606760 filed by Donald Hoyland. (Breslo, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln National Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell G Petti