This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2021 at 10:31:22 (UTC).

Hoya Corporation et al v. Alcon Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Hoya Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alcon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03629

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hoya Corporation

Hoya Surgical Optics Inc

Defendants

Alcon Inc

Alcon Laboratories Inc

Alcon Research LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren L Fornarotto

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue 50Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Theodore Stevenson, III

Attorney at McKool Smith

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Geoffrey L Smith

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

300 W 6Th St, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Gregg F LoCascio

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jeanne M Heffernan

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

USPTO Report AO120

1 #8

Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit(s) 6

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time For Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint [ECF No. #7 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants have until 2/19/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 1/13/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Surgical Optics Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alcon Research LLC. Waiver sent on 12/11/2020. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alcon Laboratories Inc. Waiver sent on 12/11/2020. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alcon Inc. Waiver sent on 12/11/2020. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Main Document 3 corrected and replaced on 12/15/2020) (mjr). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Surgical Optics Inc. (See document #1 -8 for image) (axm) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Hoya Corporation, Hoya Surgical Optics, Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11434330) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, #9 USPTO Report AO120) (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcon Research, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeanne M. Heffernan