This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2019 at 08:07:01 (UTC).

Howell v. Daewon America, Inc. (CONSENT)

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Howell filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Daewon America, Inc CONSENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M. Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M. Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devin Howell

Defendant

Daewon America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kira Yalon Fonteneau

Attorney at The Five Points Law Group LLC

2151 Highland Avenue, Suite 205

Birmingham, AL 35205

Felicia Teanna Long

5 Points Law Group Llc, 2151 Highland Ave S

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn Morris Willis

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North 20Th Street; Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Ingu Hwang

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

445 Dexter Avenue; Suite 2040

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: setting on-the-record Pretrial Conference for 3/13/2020 before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden, in Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2019; Discovery completed by 8/14/2019; dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/13/2019; Mediation Notice due by 8/19/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/28/19. Furnished to calendar group & CB.(djy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Daewon America, Inc. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Devin Howell. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Willis, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/26/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete and send to the clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 2/26/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/5/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daewon America, Inc.. (Willis, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daewon America, Inc..(Willis, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) for Daewon America, Inc. served on (no date given), answer due 2/5/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Daewon America, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Devin Howell. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Devin Howell. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

1 #2

fee receipt

1 #1

civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Daewon America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051935.), filed by Devin Howell. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: setting on-the-record Pretrial Conference for 3/13/2020 before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden, in Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2019; Discovery completed by 8/14/2019; dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/13/2019; Mediation Notice due by 8/19/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/28/19. Furnished to calendar group & CB.(djy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Daewon America, Inc. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Devin Howell. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Willis, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Attorney Ingu Hwang for Daewon America, Inc. added pursuant to #6 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/26/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete and send to the clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 2/26/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/5/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daewon America, Inc.. (Willis, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daewon America, Inc..(Willis, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) for Daewon America, Inc. served on (no date given), answer due 2/5/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Daewon America, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Devin Howell. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Devin Howell. (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Devin Howell. (No PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Daewon America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051935.), filed by Devin Howell. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.